Case Last Refreshed: 1 month ago
Cullen, Daniel J, Esq., Laureti & Associates, Apc, The Kane Law Firm, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Mahoney, Matthew Miguel, against Corey, Luzaich, & Riddle, Llp, Danko Meredith, Apc, Gibbs Law Group, Llp, in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts Superior with Mosbarger, Tamara L presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMosbarger, Tamara L Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 04, 2023 |
Category(37) Unlimited Other Contract |
Last RefreshedMarch 06, 2024 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
This legal document is a complaint filed by Plaintiffs Laureti & Associates, APC, Daniel J. Cullen, Esq., and The Kane Law Firm against Defendants Gibbs Law Group, LLP, Corey, Luzaich, & Riddle, LLP, Danko Meredith, APC, and Does 1 through 10. The co...
Case Management Conference
Date: May 29, 2024Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt
Date: January 18, 2024Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt
Date: January 18, 2024Proof of Service of Summons Filed
Date: December 14, 2023Summons Issued and Filed
Date: December 04, 2023Notice of Assignment and Case Management Conference
Date: December 06, 2023Complaint
Date: December 04, 2023Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: December 04, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 29, 2024 |
Complaint Case Management Conference Judge: Mosbarger, Tamara L |
||
March 06, 2024 | Tentative Ruling | 23CV03368 CULLEN, DANIEL J, ESQ. ET AL V. GIBBS LAW GROUP, LLP ET AL EVENT: Defendants’ Motion to Transfer Venue Defendants’ Request for Judicial Notice is granted. The Court declines to rule on Defen... | |
January 18, 2024 |
Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt Re: Danko Meredith APC Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt |
||
January 18, 2024 |
Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt Re: Corey Luzaich and Riddle LLP Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt |
||
December 14, 2023 |
Proof of Service of Summons/Complaint as to Gibbs Law Group LLP Proof of Service of Summons Filed |
||
December 06, 2023 |
Notice of Assignment and Case Management Conference
Judge: Mosbarger, Tamara L |
||
December 04, 2023 | Summons Issued and Filed | ||
December 04, 2023 | Cause Of Action | ||
December 04, 2023 | Proof of Service | ||
December 04, 2023 | Complaint |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.