Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Lomeli, Baneli, filed a(n) General Employment - Labor and Employment case represented by Aiwazian, Arby, against Environmental Alternatives, in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts Superior with Benson, Stephen E presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 23, 2023 |
Category(15) Unlimited Other Employment |
Last RefreshedJanuary 27, 2024 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Employment |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
This complaint is a class action complaint for damages filed in the Superior Court of the State of California, County of Butte. The plaintiff, Baneli Lomeli, is suing Environmental Alternatives, a California corporation, and Does 1 through 100 for va...
Case Management Conference
Date: April 17, 2024Proof of Service of Summons Filed
Date: December 21, 2023Answer - Response - Denial - Unlimited
Date: December 22, 2023Summons Issued and Filed
Date: October 23, 2023Complaint
Date: October 23, 2023Notice of Assignment and Case Management Conference
Date: October 24, 2023Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: October 23, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 17, 2024 |
Proof of Service of Summons Case Management Conference Judge: Benson, Stephen E |
||
December 22, 2023 |
Answer to Complaint Answer - Response - Denial - Unlimited |
||
December 22, 2023 | Complex Case Designation - Defendant | ||
December 21, 2023 | Proof of Service of Summons Filed | ||
October 24, 2023 |
Notice of Assignment and Case Management Conference
Judge: Benson, Stephen E |
||
October 23, 2023 | Summons Issued and Filed | ||
October 23, 2023 | Complaint | ||
October 23, 2023 | Civil Case Cover Sheet | ||
October 23, 2023 | Cause Of Action | ||
October 23, 2023 | Complex Case Designation - Plaintiff |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.