Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Zarate, Edgar, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Barry, David N, against Fca Us Llc, in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts Superior with Rigali, James F presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 20, 2023 |
CategoryUnlimited Breach Of Contract/Warranty (06) |
Last RefreshedDecember 22, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
This complaint is filed by Plaintiff Edgar Zarate against Defendant FCA US, LLC and Does 1 through 20. The complaint alleges breach of implied warranty of merchantability under The Song-Beverly Act and breach of express warranty under The Song-Beverl...
88835Notic00ba77
Date: December 21, 2023Case Management Conference
Date: October 30, 2023Notice of Case Assignment/Case Management Conf, Filed
Date: June 26, 2023Civil Case Cover Sheet Addendum (Local Form), Filed
Date: June 20, 2023Civil Case Cover Sheet, Filed
Date: June 20, 2023Complaint, Filed
Date: June 20, 2023Summons Issued, Filed
Date: June 20, 2023Complaint - Scanned
Date: June 20, 2023Civil Case Cover Sheet Addendum - Scanned
Date: June 20, 2023Civil Case Cover Sheet - Scanned
Date: June 20, 2023Summons - Scanned
Date: June 20, 20237-7-23 - POS Summons - Zarate
Date: July 14, 2023Zarate PLD ANSWER TO COMPLAINT
Date: August 03, 2023Zarate PLD NOT REMOVAL - STATE COURT
Date: August 04, 202384774NOTIC002a55
Date: October 16, 202384774Notic0227b1
Date: October 16, 202384774CaseM01fef0
Date: October 16, 2023notice of ruling
Date: November 06, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 21, 2023 | Docket Event | 88835Notic00ba77 | |
November 06, 2023 | Docket Event | notice of ruling | |
October 30, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Assignment and CMC Hrg (North) Case Management Conference Judge: Rigali, James F |
|
October 16, 2023 | Docket Event | 84774NOTIC002a55 | |
October 16, 2023 | Docket Event | 84774Notic0227b1 | |
October 16, 2023 | Docket Event | 84774CaseM01fef0 | |
October 12, 2023 | Docket Event | 84568CaseM00fa13 | |
August 04, 2023 | Docket Event | Zarate PLD NOT REMOVAL - STATE COURT | |
August 03, 2023 | Docket Event | Zarate PLD ANSWER TO COMPLAINT | |
July 14, 2023 | Docket Event | 7-7-23 - POS Summons - Zarate |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.