Case Last Refreshed: 1 month ago
Jordan, Nicole E, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Roshanian, Tamineh, against Green, Jamie Cathleen, Jordan, Angela M, Jordan, Jennifer, Price, Sheila T, Rogers Sheffield & Campbell Llp, (total of 6) See All in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts Superior with Rigali, James F presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRigali, James F Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 22, 2023 |
CategoryUnlimited Breach Of Contract/Warranty (06) |
Last RefreshedMarch 16, 2024 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
This complaint alleges multiple claims against the defendants. The plaintiff, Nicole Emily Jordan, is the daughter of Dr. Borimir Jordan and Virginia Jordan, who are deceased. Nicole is the sole successor trustee and beneficiary of the Borimir and Vi...
2024-03-15 GREEN Request for Judicial Notice FAC
Date: March 15, 20242024-03-15 GREEN Mx to Strike FAC
Date: March 15, 20242024-03-15 GREEN Demurrer to FAC
Date: March 15, 2024Defs. Request for Judicial Notice
Date: March 15, 2024Declaration of Kenny Brooks iso Demurrer
Date: March 15, 2024Motion to Strike
Date: March 15, 2024Defs. Demurrer to FAC
Date: March 15, 2024Declaration re Automatic Demurrer Extension 02.07.24
Date: February 07, 2024Declaration of Demurring Party (2)
Date: February 06, 20242023-12-07 Nicole Jordan CM Statement
Date: December 08, 202323CV02702.11202023 Notice of Posting Jury Fee - Jamie Cathleen Green
Date: November 21, 202323CV02702.CMC Statement Jamie C. Green COSB.11-20-2023
Date: November 21, 202323CV02702.11202023 Demand for Jury Trial - Jamie Cathleen Green
Date: November 21, 2023Summons Issued, Filed
Date: June 22, 2023Case Management Conference
Date: October 30, 2023Notice of Case Assignment/Case Management Conf, Filed
Date: June 26, 2023Complaint, Filed
Date: June 22, 20232023.06.21 NJordan v. RSC complaint
Date: June 22, 2023NJordan v. Roggers Sheffield Summons
Date: June 22, 20232023-06-21 Jordan v. RSC civil cover sheet
Date: June 29, 20232023-06-21 Jordan v. RSC ccs Addendum
Date: June 29, 20232023-06-20 Jordan v. RSC- RFJN
Date: June 29, 20232023-06-30 Jordan v. RSC - 170.6 Declaration
Date: June 30, 2023Order on Court Fee Waiver-Hearing Set, Filed
Date: June 29, 2023Request for Judicial Notice, Filed
Date: June 29, 2023Civil Case Cover Sheet, Filed
Date: June 29, 2023Civil Case Cover Sheet Addendum (Local Form), Filed
Date: June 29, 2023Disqualification/Challenge, Filed
Date: June 30, 2023Hearing: Fee Waiver
Date: July 11, 2023Angela (Jordan) Hart Affidavit of Nonservice
Date: July 26, 2023Jamie Green Affidavit of Service
Date: July 26, 2023Rogers Sheffield Affidavit of Service
Date: July 26, 2023Jennifer Hempfling Affidavit of service
Date: July 26, 2023Price-SheffieldAffidavit of Service
Date: July 26, 2023Declaration of Demurring Party - Rogers Sheffield Campbell
Date: August 16, 2023Motion to Strike
Date: September 05, 2023Demurrer
Date: September 05, 2023Request for Judicial Notice
Date: September 05, 2023Sheila Price Demurrer
Date: September 07, 2023Sheila Price Motion to Strike
Date: September 07, 2023Request for Judicial Notice
Date: September 07, 202323CV2702 - Request for Judicial Notice with Exhibits - Jamie Cathleen Green.09-14-2023
Date: September 14, 202323CV02702. Demurrer - Jamie Cathleen Green.09-14-2023
Date: September 14, 202323CV02702.Motion to Strike - Jamie Cathleen Green.09-14-2023
Date: September 14, 2023NJordan Opposition to Sheffield Demurrer
Date: October 04, 20232023-10-03 E-POS Green Dem.- MTS
Date: October 04, 20232023-10-03 E-POS re NJ RSC
Date: October 04, 20232023-10-03 NJordan .opp to Greeen MTS
Date: October 04, 2023NJordan Opposition to Demurrer
Date: October 04, 20232023-10-03 NJordan .opp to RSC MTS
Date: October 04, 2023Reply iso Demurrer MTS
Date: October 09, 202323CV02702 - Oct. 9 2023 - COSB's Reply to Oppo to Demurrer Strike - Jamie Cathleen Green
Date: October 09, 20232023-10-10 NJordan Opp to Price Demurrer
Date: October 11, 20232023-10-10 NJordan .opp to Price MTS
Date: October 11, 2023Jordan v. Sheffield - Amended EPOS re RSC
Date: October 11, 2023Jordan v. Sheffield - Amended EPOS re Green
Date: October 11, 2023Reply iso Demurrer and MTS
Date: October 16, 2023Reply iso Demurrer and MTS
Date: October 18, 2023Jordan v Rogers et al - Stipulation to Continue CMC-Signed by all Counsel
Date: October 25, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 15, 2024 | Docket Event | 2024-03-15 GREEN Request for Judicial Notice FAC | |
March 15, 2024 | Docket Event | 2024-03-15 GREEN Mx to Strike FAC | |
March 15, 2024 | Docket Event | 2024-03-15 GREEN Demurrer to FAC | |
March 15, 2024 | Docket Event | Defs. Request for Judicial Notice | |
March 15, 2024 | Docket Event | Declaration of Kenny Brooks iso Demurrer | |
March 15, 2024 | Docket Event | Motion to Strike | |
March 15, 2024 | Docket Event | Defs. Demurrer to FAC | |
February 07, 2024 | Docket Event | Declaration re Automatic Demurrer Extension 02.07.24 | |
February 06, 2024 | Docket Event | Declaration of Demurring Party (2) | |
December 11, 2023 | Tentative Ruling |
Judge: Judge Colleen K. Sterne |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.