Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Witter, Christian, Witter, Dean, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Lebental, Miriam J, against Ballas, Ryan, in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts Superior with Anderle, Thomas P presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeAnderle, Thomas P Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 23, 2023 |
CategoryUnlimited Other Pi/Pd/Wd (23) |
Last RefreshedJanuary 20, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
This complaint is filed by plaintiffs Dean Witter and Christian Witter against defendant Ryan Ballas and Does 1 through 10. The plaintiffs allege negligence on the part of the defendants, resulting in injuries and damages. The plaintiffs claim that t...
NOTICE OF DEPOSIT OF JURY FEES BY DEF. RYAN BALLAS
Date: January 19, 2024CMC STMT - Witter v. Ballas
Date: January 05, 2024Civil Case Cover Sheet, Filed
Date: June 23, 2023Complaint, Filed
Date: June 23, 2023Civil Case Cover Sheet Addendum (Local Form), Filed
Date: June 23, 2023Wittercivilcoversheet_06232023164532
Date: June 24, 2023Summonswitter_06232023170415
Date: June 24, 2023Complaintwitter_06232023170440
Date: June 24, 2023Civilcaseaddendumwitter_06232023170339
Date: June 24, 2023Complaint, Filed
Date: June 23, 2023Summons Issued, Filed
Date: June 23, 2023Case Management Conference
Date: October 25, 2023Notice of Case Assignment/Case Management Conf, Filed
Date: June 29, 2023Case Management Statement
Date: October 03, 2023Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint
Date: November 08, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 19, 2024 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF DEPOSIT OF JURY FEES BY DEF. RYAN BALLAS | |
January 05, 2024 | Docket Event | CMC STMT - Witter v. Ballas | |
November 08, 2023 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint | |
October 25, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Assignment and CMC Hrg (South) Case Management Conference Judge: Anderle, Thomas P |
|
October 03, 2023 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement | |
June 29, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Assignment and CMC Hrg (South) Notice of Case Assignment/Case Management Conf, Filed |
|
June 24, 2023 | Docket Event | Wittercivilcoversheet_06232023164532 | |
June 24, 2023 | Docket Event | Summonswitter_06232023170415 | |
June 24, 2023 | Docket Event | Complaintwitter_06232023170440 | |
June 24, 2023 | Docket Event | Civilcaseaddendumwitter_06232023170339 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.