Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago
Vadas, Susanna, filed a(n) Malpractice - Torts case represented by James, Patricia I, against Kovacs, Brent J, Md, Kovacs, M.D., Brent J., in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts Superior with Anderle, Thomas P presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeAnderle, Thomas P Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 15, 2023 |
CategoryUnlimited Medical Malpractice (45) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
Matter TypeMalpractice |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Management Statement
Date: February 21, 2024Notice of Jury Fee Deposit
Date: February 21, 2024POS - CMC Stmt
Date: February 21, 2024CMS_B_Kovacs_2_13_24_Signed_1
Date: February 13, 2024CMS_Kovacs_Signed_1
Date: February 13, 2024Ntc_of_Jury_Fees_Paid
Date: January 19, 2024Demand_for_Jury_trial
Date: January 18, 2024Declaration_of_Trial_co
Date: January 18, 2024Answer
Date: January 18, 2024Ex Parte - Decl of CMD
Date: December 29, 2023Ex Parte - Mem of Ps and As
Date: December 29, 2023Ex Parte
Date: December 29, 2023POS - Personal Service
Date: December 20, 2023Sub of Atty
Date: December 04, 2023Civil Case Cover Sheet, Filed
Date: June 15, 2023Complaint, Filed
Date: June 15, 202377485SUSAN004e1f
Date: June 15, 202377485Summo02edd8
Date: June 15, 202377485SUSAN015360
Date: June 15, 2023Summons Issued, Filed
Date: June 15, 2023Civil Case Cover Sheet, Filed
Date: June 15, 2023Complaint, Filed
Date: June 15, 2023Notice of Case Assignment/Case Management Conf, Filed
Date: June 21, 2023Case Management Conference
Date: October 18, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 21, 2024 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement | |
February 21, 2024 | Docket Event | Notice of Jury Fee Deposit | |
February 21, 2024 | Docket Event | POS - CMC Stmt | |
February 13, 2024 | Docket Event | CMS_B_Kovacs_2_13_24_Signed_1 | |
February 13, 2024 | Docket Event | CMS_Kovacs_Signed_1 | |
January 19, 2024 | Docket Event | Ntc_of_Jury_Fees_Paid | |
January 18, 2024 | Docket Event | Demand_for_Jury_trial | |
January 18, 2024 | Docket Event | Declaration_of_Trial_co | |
January 18, 2024 | Docket Event | Answer | |
December 29, 2023 | Docket Event | Ex Parte - Decl of CMD |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.