Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Franco, Kelly, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Shapiro, Sutton Adam, against Cool Time, Llc, Doe, John, The Socotra Fund, Llc, represented by Nguyen, Darrell Viet, in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts Superior with Mosbarger, Tamara L presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMosbarger, Tamara L Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 30, 2023 |
Category(23) Unlimited Other Pi/Pd/Wd |
Last RefreshedJanuary 27, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
This complaint is a legal document filed by Kelly Franco against The Socotra Fund, LLC, Cool Time, LLC, John Doe, and Does 1 through 50. The complaint alleges negligence and premises liability as the causes of action. The incident occurred on or abou...
Case Management Conference
Date: February 21, 2024Demand for Jury Trial
Date: October 06, 2023Answer - Response - Denial - Unlimited
Date: October 06, 2023Request for Dismissal - Entered in Part
Date: September 07, 2023Proof of Service of Summons Filed
Date: September 01, 2023Notice of Assignment and Case Management Conference
Date: August 31, 2023Proof of Service of Summons Filed
Date: September 01, 2023Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: August 30, 2023Summons Issued and Filed
Date: August 30, 2023Complaint
Date: August 30, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 21, 2024 |
Defendant Cool Time, LLC's Answer Case Management Conference Judge: Mosbarger, Tamara L |
||
October 06, 2023 | Jury Deposit - Non Refundable | ||
October 06, 2023 | Demand for Jury Trial | ||
October 06, 2023 |
Defendant Cool Time, LLC's Answer Answer - Response - Denial - Unlimited |
||
September 07, 2023 |
Request for Dismissal - Entered in Part as to Socotra Fund, LLC Request for Dismissal - Entered in Part |
||
September 01, 2023 |
Proof of Service of Summons as to Cool Time, LLC Proof of Service of Summons Filed |
||
September 01, 2023 |
Proof of Service of Summons as to The Socotra Fund, LLC Proof of Service of Summons Filed |
||
August 31, 2023 |
Notice of Assignment and Case Management Conference
Judge: Mosbarger, Tamara L |
||
August 30, 2023 | Cause Of Action | ||
August 30, 2023 | Proof of Service |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.