Case Last Refreshed: 3 days ago
Pinney, Diane, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Hiller, David Wesley, against Al-Siddiq, Rufia, Al- Siddiq, Waqaas, Qadisiyyah Ranch Llc, represented by Gamboa, Rene Ignacio, in the jurisdiction of Sonoma County. This case was filed in Sonoma County Superior Courts with Broderick, Patrick presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBroderick, Patrick Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 11, 2023 |
Category37: Unlimited Other Contract |
Last RefreshedApril 24, 2024 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSonoma County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
95716NOTIC002077
Date: April 10, 202494185DECLA041c68
Date: March 19, 202494185MEMOR037a27
Date: March 19, 202494185REQUE02328d
Date: March 19, 202494185NOTIC01c847
Date: March 19, 202494185DEMUR00ebd2
Date: March 19, 202493109DECLA05a535
Date: March 02, 202493109PROPO047519
Date: March 02, 202493109MEMOR03bf21
Date: March 02, 202493109MEMOR02cb86
Date: March 02, 202493109REQUE01846e
Date: March 02, 202493109NOTIC00ec94
Date: March 02, 202489493Notic03d99f
Date: January 05, 202489493Proof01500e
Date: January 05, 202489493Proof024f9e
Date: January 05, 202489493Proof00f6d1
Date: January 05, 202488119Civil025c4a
Date: December 11, 202388119Summo01f16a
Date: December 11, 202388119Compl00583d
Date: December 11, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 05, 2024 | Docket Event |
Demurrer_____B
Judge: Broderick, Patrick |
|
April 30, 2024 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Broderick, Patrick |
|
April 10, 2024 | Docket Event | 95716NOTIC002077 | |
March 30, 2024 | Docket Event | Notice of Informal Conference & Sanctions | |
March 19, 2024 | Docket Event |
Notice of Demurrer |
|
March 19, 2024 | Docket Event |
Declaration of REN I. GAMBOA ISO Demurrer |
|
March 19, 2024 | Docket Event |
Memo of P&A in Support ISO Demurrer |
|
March 19, 2024 | Docket Event | Motion for Demurrer | |
March 19, 2024 | Docket Event |
Request for Judicial Notice ISO Demurrer |
|
March 19, 2024 | Docket Event | 94185DECLA041c68 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.