Case Last Refreshed: 2 weeks ago
Clements, Kathryn, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Guenther, Ralph Phillip, against Comelli, Donna L, Comelli, John, Roubal, Ryan, represented by Levini, Jenifer, in the jurisdiction of Santa Cruz County. This case was filed in Santa Cruz County Superior Courts Superior with Cogliati, Syda Kosofsky presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCogliati, Syda Kosofsky Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 03, 2023 |
Category(37) Unlimited Other Contract |
Last RefreshedApril 12, 2024 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSanta Cruz County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
POS - Reply
Date: April 08, 2024Reply
Date: April 08, 202423CV01564_DECLARATION_OF_JENIFER_LEVINI
Date: March 22, 202423CV01564_NOTICE_OF_MOTION_TO_COMPEL
Date: March 22, 202423CV01564_PROPOSED_ORDER
Date: March 22, 202423CV01564_SEPARATE_STATE_OF_MOTION_TO_COMPEL
Date: March 22, 202423CV01564_MEMORANDUM_OF_POINTS_AND
Date: March 22, 2024Proof of Service of Summons - JC
Date: August 17, 2023Proof of Service of Summons - DC
Date: August 17, 202323CV01564_Defendants_Answer
Date: August 19, 202323CV01564PoS_Eservice8_18_23
Date: August 19, 2023POS - CMS -
Date: October 18, 2023Case Management Statement
Date: October 18, 2023Request for Entry of Default - Roubal - corrected
Date: October 18, 202323CV01564_CMS_ePOS_Comelli
Date: October 27, 202323CV01564_CMC_Statement_Comelli
Date: October 27, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 08, 2024 | Docket Event | Proof of Electronic Service | |
April 08, 2024 | Docket Event |
Reply Filed Party: Plaintiff CLEMENTS, KATHRYN |
|
April 08, 2024 | Docket Event | POS - Reply | |
April 08, 2024 | Docket Event | Reply | |
April 03, 2024 | Docket Event |
Mediation Brief Lodged Party: Defendant COMELLI, DONNA L; Defendant COMELLI, JOHN |
|
April 02, 2024 | Docket Event |
Mediation Brief Lodged Party: Defendant COMELLI, DONNA L; Defendant COMELLI, JOHN |
|
March 22, 2024 | Docket Event |
Declaration Filing Party: Defendant COMELLI, DONNA L; Defendant COMELLI, JOHN |
|
March 22, 2024 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order/Judgment Received Party: Defendant COMELLI, DONNA L; Defendant COMELLI, JOHN |
|
March 22, 2024 | Docket Event |
Memorandum of Points & Authorities Party: Defendant COMELLI, DONNA L; Defendant COMELLI, JOHN |
|
March 22, 2024 | Docket Event |
Motion Filing Party: Defendant COMELLI, DONNA L; Defendant COMELLI, JOHN |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.