Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Aristotle Custom Homes, Llc, Horylev, Sean, Smith, Chelsea, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Wieder, Andrea, against American Contractors Indemnity Company, Aristotle Custom Homes, Llc, Garbolinsky, Greg, Power, Stephanie, represented by Kim, Amber Nicole, Rahimzadeh, Yasha, in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts Superior with Mosbarger, Tamara L presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 01, 2023 |
Category(06) Unlimited Breach Of Contract/Warranty |
Last RefreshedJanuary 27, 2024 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
This complaint is a legal document filed by Sean Horylev and Chelsea Smith against Aristotle Custom Homes, LLC, Greg Garbolinsky, American Contractors Indemnity Company, and other unnamed defendants. The complaint alleges breach of contract and contr...
Complaint
Date: June 01, 2023Case Management Conference
Date: February 28, 2024Association of Counsel
Date: December 13, 2023Answer - No Fee
Date: November 30, 2023Minute Order
Date: November 29, 2023Case Management Conference
Date: November 29, 2023Answer - Response - Denial - Unlimited
Date: November 22, 2023Cross Complaint - No Fee
Date: November 16, 2023Answer - Response - Denial - Unlimited
Date: November 16, 2023Proof of Service
Date: November 16, 2023Case Management Statement
Date: November 16, 2023Notice of Assignment and Case Management Conference
Date: June 02, 2023Case Management Statement
Date: November 06, 2023Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt
Date: October 10, 2023Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt
Date: August 29, 2023Summons Issued and Filed
Date: June 06, 2023Amended Complaint
Date: June 06, 2023Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: June 01, 2023Summons Issued and Filed
Date: June 01, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 28, 2024 |
Answer to Cross-Complaint of Aristotle Custom Homes LLC Case Management Conference Judge: Mosbarger, Tamara L |
||
December 13, 2023 |
Association of Attorney/Counsel Association of Counsel |
||
November 30, 2023 |
Answer to Cross-Complaint of Aristotle Custom Homes LLC Answer - No Fee |
||
November 29, 2023 |
Civil Minutes Minute Order |
||
November 29, 2023 |
Answer to Complaint by American Contractors Indemnity Company Case Management Conference Judge: Mosbarger, Tamara L |
||
November 22, 2023 |
Answer to Complaint by American Contractors Indemnity Company Answer - Response - Denial - Unlimited |
||
November 16, 2023 |
Aristotle Custom Homes, LLC's Cross Complaint Cross Complaint - No Fee |
||
November 16, 2023 |
Aristotle Custom Homes, LLC, Greg Garbolinsky, and Stephanie Power's Answer Answer - Response - Denial - Unlimited |
||
November 16, 2023 | Proof of Service | ||
November 16, 2023 |
Aristotle Custom Homes, Inc's Case Management Statement Case Management Statement |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.