Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Discover Bank, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Wallace, Douglas Stuart, against Castellanos, Martin, represented by Tunder, Jennifer Lynn, in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts Superior with Benson, Stephen E presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 10, 2023 |
Category(09) Limited Rule 3.740 Collections - Under 10,000 |
Last RefreshedJanuary 27, 2024 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Notice of Hearing
Date: September 26, 2023Proof of Service of Summons Filed
Date: May 15, 2023Complaint
Date: May 10, 2023Notice of Assignment and Case Management Conference
Date: August 10, 2023Status Conference
Date: October 02, 2024Case Management Conference
Date: September 27, 2023Case Management Statement
Date: September 21, 2023Stipulation - No Fee
Date: September 13, 2023Conditional Settlement
Date: September 13, 2023Case Management Statement
Date: August 28, 2023Answer - Response - Denial - Limited up to $10,000
Date: August 08, 2023Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: May 10, 2023Summons Issued and Filed
Date: May 10, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 02, 2024 |
Stipulation for Entry of Judgement Pending Performance Pursuant to Code of Civil Procedure 664.6 Status Conference Reported as Settled, Dismissal to be Filed Judge: Benson, Stephen E |
||
September 27, 2023 |
Defendant's Case Management Statement Case Management Conference Judge: Benson, Stephen E |
||
September 26, 2023 |
Request for Dismissal-Conditional Settlement Notice of Hearing Re Request for Conditional Settlement |
||
September 21, 2023 |
Defendant's Case Management Statement Case Management Statement |
||
September 13, 2023 |
Stipulation for Entry of Judgement Pending Performance Pursuant to Code of Civil Procedure 664.6 Stipulation - No Fee Stipulation for Entry of Judgement Pending Performance Pursuant to Code of Civil Procedure Section 664.6 |
||
September 13, 2023 | Conditional Settlement | ||
August 28, 2023 |
Plaintiff's Case Management Statement Case Management Statement |
||
August 10, 2023 |
Notice of Assignment and Case Management Conference
Judge: Benson, Stephen E |
||
August 08, 2023 | Answer - Response - Denial - Limited up to $10,000 | ||
May 15, 2023 | Proof of Service of Summons Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.