Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Oriana Cosina, As Personal Representative Of The Estate Of Jesus Zacarias, filed a(n) Judgment Enforcement - Creditor case represented by Hansen, Chance Merrill, against Zacarias, Catalina, in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts Superior with Benson, Stephen E presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 01, 2023 |
Category(20) Unlimited Sister - State Judgment |
Last RefreshedJanuary 27, 2024 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
Matter TypeJudgment Enforcement |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Minute Order
Date: January 24, 2024Motion Hearings - Postdisposition
Date: January 24, 2024Proof of Mailing
Date: January 25, 2024Judgment
Date: January 24, 2024Motion - Fee
Date: December 21, 2023Notice of Entry of Judgment, Order or Ruling
Date: August 30, 2023Notice
Date: May 01, 2023Judgment
Date: May 01, 2023Application for Entry of Judgment on Sister - State Judgment
Date: May 01, 2023Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: May 01, 2023Notice
Date: May 01, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 25, 2024 | Proof of Mailing | ||
January 24, 2024 | Tentative Ruling | 23CV01203 Oriana Cosina, as Personal Representative of the Estate of Jesus Zacarias v. Zacarias, Catalina EVENT: Motion to Amend Judgment Correct Legal Name of Judgment Debtor Motion to Amend Judgment... | |
January 24, 2024 |
Civil Minutes Minute Order |
||
January 24, 2024 |
Notice of Motion and Motion to Amend Name of Judgment Debtor; Declaration of Hansen Motion Hearings - Postdisposition Plaintiff's Motion to Amend Name of Judgment Debtor Judge: Benson, Stephen E |
||
January 24, 2024 |
Amended Judgment on Sister-State Judgment Judgment Judge: Benson, Stephen E |
||
January 24, 2024 |
Tentative Ruling Motion to Amend Judgment Correct Legal Name of Judgment Debtor is GRANTED. The Court will sign the proposed judgment. |
||
December 21, 2023 |
Notice of Motion and Motion to Amend Name of Judgment Debtor; Declaration of Hansen; Memorandum of Points & Authorities Motion - Fee |
||
August 30, 2023 |
Notice of Entry of Judgment on Sister-State Judgment Served Notice of Entry of Judgment, Order or Ruling |
||
May 01, 2023 |
Notice of Entry or Judgment on Sister-State Judgment Issued Notice |
||
May 01, 2023 |
Judgment on Sister-State Judgment Judgment |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.