Case Last Refreshed: 4 weeks ago
Arrison, Nathan, Carabetta, Shannon, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Dolin, Tionna Grace, against American Honda Motor Co., Inc., represented by Bajaj, Reshma Amarlal, Hugret, Spencer P, Suarez, Jeanette Catuira, in the jurisdiction of Santa Cruz County. This case was filed in Santa Cruz County Superior Courts Superior with Schmal, Timothy presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSchmal, Timothy Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 12, 2023 |
Category(06) Unlimited Breach Of Contract / Warranty |
Last RefreshedMarch 29, 2024 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSanta Cruz County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
SF195718._Proposed_Order
Date: March 25, 2024DEFS. NTC OF REMOTE APPERANCE
Date: March 11, 2024SF190670 reply
Date: February 26, 2024SF190670 declaration
Date: February 26, 2024SF190670 BRIEF
Date: February 23, 2024SF190670 DECLARATION
Date: February 23, 202492299Reque00c152
Date: February 20, 202492222REQUE0157b6
Date: February 17, 202492222PLAIN005a28
Date: February 17, 2024SF182843 - RB Decl. ISO Honda MTC Arb
Date: January 09, 2024SF182843 - MPA ISO Honda MTC Arb
Date: January 08, 2024SF182843 - Proposed Order Honda MTC Arb
Date: January 08, 2024SF182843 - Honda's Ntc MTC Arb
Date: January 08, 202405122023 Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: May 12, 202305122023 Complaint
Date: May 12, 202305122023 Summons
Date: May 12, 2023Affidavit
Date: May 17, 2023SF151104.5248946.20230613_Carabetta__Answer
Date: June 13, 2023DEFS. CMS FOR 09.11.23.
Date: August 26, 202381718CaseM014815
Date: August 29, 202381718Notic0095fd
Date: August 29, 202381718Notic02c690
Date: August 29, 2023NtcofRemote
Date: September 07, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 26, 2024 | Docket Event | Order After Hearing | |
March 25, 2024 | Docket Event | SF195718._Proposed_Order | |
March 11, 2024 | Docket Event | Notice of Remote Appearance Filed | |
March 11, 2024 | Docket Event | DEFS. NTC OF REMOTE APPERANCE | |
February 26, 2024 | Docket Event | Declaration | |
February 26, 2024 | Docket Event | Reply Filed | |
February 26, 2024 | Docket Event | SF190670 reply | |
February 26, 2024 | Docket Event | SF190670 declaration | |
February 23, 2024 | Docket Event | Reply Filed | |
February 23, 2024 | Docket Event | SF190670 BRIEF |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.