Case Last Refreshed: 45 minutes ago
Wyatt Knotts Construction, Inc., filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case against Does 1-20, Tito Magobet, Vicky Magobet, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts Superior.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 01, 2023 |
Category(Breach Of Contract/Warranty) |
Last RefreshedMay 02, 2024 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
The complaint filed in the Superior Court of California, Sacramento by attorney Brian R. Katz on behalf of Wyatt Knotts Construction, Inc. against defendants Tito Magobet, Vicky Magobet, and others alleges breach of contract, quantum meruit, and fore...
Complaint
Date: November 01, 2023Answer
Date: February 22, 2024Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: November 17, 2023Cross-Complaint
Date: January 10, 2024Declaration of DUSTIN M. AMREIN ISO Motion to Quash
Date: March 15, 2024Stipulation and Order for Issuance of a Protective Order
Date: April 19, 2024Answer
Date: January 10, 2024Memorandum of Points & Authorities ISO Motion to Quash
Date: March 15, 2024Notice of Lis Pendens
Date: November 01, 2023Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: February 27, 2024Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: November 01, 2023Motion to Quash
Date: March 15, 2024Proposed Order Granting Motion to Quash
Date: March 15, 2024Summons on Complaint
Date: November 01, 2023Separate Statement ISO Motion to Quash
Date: March 15, 2024Summons on Cross Complaint
Date: January 19, 2024Notice of Case Assignment and Case Management Conference
Date: November 02, 2023Summons on Complaint
Date: November 02, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 19, 2024 |
Stipulation and Order for Issuance of a Protective Order Document |
||
March 15, 2024 |
Declaration of DUSTIN M. AMREIN ISO Motion to Quash Document |
||
March 15, 2024 |
Memorandum of Points & Authorities ISO Motion to Quash Document |
||
March 15, 2024 |
Motion to Quash Document |
||
March 15, 2024 |
Proposed Order Granting Motion to Quash Document |
||
March 15, 2024 |
Separate Statement ISO Motion to Quash Document |
||
February 27, 2024 |
Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Document |
||
February 22, 2024 |
Answer Document |
||
January 19, 2024 |
Summons on Cross Complaint Document |
||
January 10, 2024 |
Cross-Complaint Document |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.