Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Start Inc, filed a(n) Insurance Coverage - Insurance case represented by Moon, James H, Noel, Leila J, against Brown & Brown Insurance Services Of California Inc, National Fire & Marine Insurance Company, represented by Addiego, Joseph E, Iii, Dowling, Thomas J, Moon, James H, in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts Superior with Sterne, Colleen K presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSterne, Colleen K Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 09, 2023 |
CategoryUnlimited Insurance Coverage (18) |
Last RefreshedOctober 18, 2023 |
Practice AreaInsurance |
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
Matter TypeInsurance Coverage |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
2023.03.09 Start Summons
Date: March 10, 2023Start Inc Complaint with Exhibits
Date: March 10, 2023Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: March 10, 2023Start Civil Case Cover Sheet Addendum
Date: March 10, 2023Plaintiff's Notice Of Related Case
Date: March 16, 202323.03.20 Proof of Service of Summons to National Fire & Marine Insurance Company
Date: March 21, 202323.03.16 Proof of Service of Summons to Brown and Brown Insurance
Date: March 22, 202323.03.24 Start Inc 170.6 Motion with Decl RL
Date: March 24, 2023National Fire & Marine Ins Co's Answer - 051023
Date: May 10, 20237669607312029148
Date: June 01, 2023766960731200f325
Date: June 01, 2023766960731201fd44
Date: June 01, 2023Proof of Service - Summons & Complaint, Filed
Date: March 21, 2023Stipulation & Order, Filed
Date: May 03, 2023Notice of Related Case, Filed
Date: March 16, 2023Summons Issued, Filed
Date: March 09, 2023Civil Case Cover Sheet, Filed
Date: March 09, 2023Disqualification/Challenge, Filed
Date: March 27, 2023Notice of Case Reassignment, Filed
Date: March 27, 2023Proof of Service - Summons & Complaint, Filed
Date: March 22, 2023Civil Case Cover Sheet Addendum (Local Form), Filed
Date: March 09, 2023Case Management Conference
Date: July 17, 2023Notice of Case Assignment/Case Management Conf, Filed
Date: March 10, 2023Complaint, Filed
Date: March 09, 2023Answer/Response/Denial - Unlimited, Filed
Date: May 10, 2023Declaration, Filed
Date: June 01, 2023Request for Judicial Notice, Filed
Date: June 01, 2023Demurrer, Filed
Date: June 01, 20232023.08.25 Start Opp to Demurrer
Date: August 26, 20232023.08.25 Start Compendium of Exhibits
Date: August 26, 20232023.08.25 Start Richard Lloyd Declaration
Date: August 26, 2023Reply ISO Demurrer to Complaint
Date: September 01, 2023Answer to Complaint 9.25.23 (2)
Date: September 25, 2023Brown CMC Statement 10.3.23
Date: October 03, 20239441 - Notice of Posting Jury Fees - 100223
Date: October 03, 20232023.10.02 Start Inc CMC Statement
Date: October 03, 2023Def National Fire and Marine Insurance Co.'s CMC Statement HRG 10-13-23
Date: October 02, 2023Notice of Posting Jury Fees 10.16.23
Date: October 16, 20232023.10.17 Start Inc. Notice of Posting Jury Fees
Date: October 17, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 17, 2023 | Docket Event | 2023.10.17 Start Inc. Notice of Posting Jury Fees | |
October 16, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Posting Jury Fees 10.16.23 | |
October 03, 2023 | Docket Event | Brown CMC Statement 10.3.23 | |
October 03, 2023 | Docket Event | 9441 - Notice of Posting Jury Fees - 100223 | |
October 03, 2023 | Docket Event | 2023.10.02 Start Inc CMC Statement | |
October 02, 2023 | Docket Event | Def National Fire and Marine Insurance Co.'s CMC Statement HRG 10-13-23 | |
September 25, 2023 | Docket Event | Answer to Complaint 9.25.23 (2) | |
September 15, 2023 | Tentative Ruling |
Nature of Proceedings: Demurrer Tentative not yet posted, plesae check again.
Judge: Judge Donna Geck |
|
September 08, 2023 | Tentative Ruling |
Nature of Proceedings: Demurrer Tentative not yet posted, please check again.
Judge: Judge Donna Geck |
|
September 01, 2023 | Docket Event | Reply ISO Demurrer to Complaint |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.