Case Last Refreshed: 1 week ago
Crabtree, Amal, filed a(n) (42) Unlimited Other Complaint (Not Spec) case represented by Kohlman, Kathryn, against Kontz, Thornton, Thompson, Kontz And Brenner, represented by Marcus, Daniel, Vucinich, Jeffrey M, in the jurisdiction of Santa Cruz County. This case was filed in Santa Cruz County Superior Courts Superior with Cogliati, Syda Kosofsky presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 07, 2023 |
Category(42) Unlimited Other Complaint (Not Spec) |
Last RefreshedApril 23, 2024 |
|
Filing LocationSanta Cruz County, CA |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Protective Order
Date: April 11, 2024s59358_Order
Date: April 05, 2024724384- CA COMM
Date: April 05, 2024Declaration of DDM
Date: March 07, 2024Opposition
Date: March 07, 2024S56484_Proof
Date: February 01, 2024s56484_COR_Motion
Date: February 01, 2024s56484_Motion
Date: January 29, 2024CMC STMT (12-6-23)
Date: December 04, 202373717Summo013dbf
Date: April 07, 202373717Compl00f4e6
Date: April 07, 202373717Civil024004
Date: April 07, 202376126Amend00697e
Date: May 22, 2023Notice of Jury Fees
Date: May 23, 2023Answer to FAC (Law Firm)
Date: May 23, 2023Answer to FAC (Thornton Kontz)
Date: May 23, 2023CMC STMT (08-07-23)
Date: August 03, 2023AMENDED CMC STMT (08-07-23)
Date: August 03, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 18, 2024 | Docket Event |
Application Fee Party: Defendant Kontz, Thornton |
|
April 18, 2024 | Docket Event |
Commission to Take Deposition Out-of-State Party: Defendant Kontz, Thornton |
|
April 18, 2024 | Docket Event | 724384- CA COMM | |
April 18, 2024 | Docket Event | 724384-3-CA COMMISSION APPLICATION | |
April 17, 2024 | Docket Event | Order After Hearing | |
April 15, 2024 | Docket Event |
Stipulation & Order Party: Defendant Kontz, Thornton; Defendant Thompson, Kontz and Brenner |
|
April 11, 2024 | Docket Event |
Stipulation & Order Party: Defendant Kontz, Thornton; Defendant Thompson, Kontz and Brenner |
|
April 11, 2024 | Docket Event | Protective Order | |
April 05, 2024 | Docket Event | s59358_Order | |
April 05, 2024 | Docket Event | 724384- CA COMM |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.