Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Butte Credit, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Selby, Joseph Luther, against Anderson, William Dana, in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts Superior with Benson, Stephen E presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 13, 2023 |
Category(09) Limited Other Collections - Small Claims Jurisdiction |
Last RefreshedJanuary 27, 2024 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
This complaint is a legal document filed in the Superior Court of California, County of Butte. The plaintiff, Butte Credit, is suing the defendant, William Dana Anderson, for money due. The principal amount claimed by the plaintiff is $3,007.03. The ...
Proof of Mailing
Date: August 28, 2023Request to Enter Default-Entered
Date: January 10, 2024Writ of Execution Issued
Date: January 10, 2024Request for Dismissal - Entered in Part
Date: December 05, 2023Case Management Conference
Date: April 03, 2024Default Judgment By Clerk
Date: January 10, 2024Declaration
Date: December 05, 2023Request to Enter Default-Not Entered
Date: December 05, 2023Proof or Affidavit of Publication
Date: November 29, 2023Minute Order
Date: October 04, 2023Case Management Conference
Date: October 04, 2023Case Management Statement
Date: September 29, 2023Order for Publication or Posting
Date: August 10, 2023Application for Publication or Posting
Date: August 02, 2023Declaration
Date: August 02, 2023Declaration
Date: August 01, 2023Minute Order
Date: July 05, 2023Case Management Conference
Date: July 05, 2023Case Management Statement
Date: May 09, 2023Complaint
Date: March 13, 2023Notice of Assignment and Case Management Conference
Date: March 14, 2023Declaration
Date: March 13, 2023Summons Issued and Filed
Date: March 13, 2023Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: March 13, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 03, 2024 |
Default Judgment by Clerk Case Management Conference Further Status Judge: Benson, Stephen E |
||
January 10, 2024 | Request to Enter Default-Entered | ||
January 10, 2024 |
Writ of Execution Issued as to Butte County Writ of Execution Issued |
||
January 10, 2024 | Default Judgment By Clerk | ||
December 05, 2023 |
Request for Dismissal as to Does 1-10 Request for Dismissal - Entered in Part |
||
December 05, 2023 |
Declaration of E Jimenez Re Interest Declaration |
||
December 05, 2023 | Request to Enter Default-Not Entered | ||
November 29, 2023 |
Proof / Affidavit of Publication Proof or Affidavit of Publication |
||
October 04, 2023 |
Civil Minutes Minute Order |
||
October 04, 2023 |
Civil Minutes Case Management Conference Further Status Judge: Benson, Stephen E |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.