Case Last Refreshed: 1 month ago
Jones, Kimberly M, Wood, Judith H, filed a(n) Malpractice - Torts case represented by Dakak, Majed, against Left Coast Inspection Llc, Wood Environmental Services Llc, Wood, Judith H, represented by Deter, Catherine L, Kung Gelini, Jennifer A, in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts Superior with Sterne, Colleen K presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSterne, Colleen K Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 07, 2023 |
CategoryUnlimited Professional Negligence (25) |
Last RefreshedMarch 16, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
Matter TypeMalpractice |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
This complaint is filed by Kimberly M. Jones against Left Coast Inspections LLC, Wood Environmental Services LLC, and Judith H. Wood. The complaint alleges professional negligence, breach of contract, and negligent infliction of emotional distress. T...
94039Cross02a7ab
Date: March 15, 202494039ANSWE00be51
Date: March 15, 202494039NOTIC0340be
Date: March 15, 202494039SUMMO017c07
Date: March 15, 202493091CaseM00e1b1
Date: March 01, 202493038CaseM001f21
Date: March 01, 20242024-02-29 JONES-4615 CMC Statement
Date: March 01, 202492717REPLY0071f1
Date: February 26, 20242024-02-20 JONES ROBLADA Opp to LCI MTS Third Amended Complaint
Date: February 20, 202488690DEFEN00d946
Date: December 20, 202387203Answe0040c2
Date: November 22, 20232023-11-15 JONES Proof of Service re TAC
Date: November 15, 20232023-11-15 JONES Third Amended Complaint
Date: November 15, 20232023-02-07 JONES Complaint (Against WES Wood and Left Coast)
Date: February 08, 20232023-02-07 JONES Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: February 08, 20232023-02-07 JONES Summons FINAL
Date: February 08, 20232023-02-07 JONES Civil Case Cover Sheet Addendum
Date: February 08, 20232023-02-13 JONES POS Summons etc - Left Coast Inspections LLC
Date: February 13, 20232023-02-17 JONES POS Summons etc - Wood Environmental Services LLC
Date: February 18, 20232023-02-17 JONES POS Summons etc - Judith H. Wood
Date: February 18, 20232023-02-22 JONES Notice of Case Assignment and CMC wExh A
Date: February 22, 20232023-02-22 JONES POS re Notice of Case Assignment and CMC
Date: February 22, 202372689Answe00c33f
Date: March 20, 20232023-05-15 JONES POS re Stipulation to Continue CMC
Date: May 15, 20232023-05-22 JONES First Amended Complaint (Ballard)
Date: May 22, 202376291DEFEN00f0a1
Date: May 24, 2023Proof of Service - Summons & Complaint, Filed
Date: February 14, 2023Proof of Service, Filed
Date: February 22, 2023Civil Case Cover Sheet Addendum (Local Form), Filed
Date: February 07, 2023Proof of Service - Summons & Complaint, Filed
Date: February 17, 2023Complaint, Filed
Date: February 07, 2023Stipulation and Order for Continuance, Filed
Date: May 18, 2023Amended Complaint, Filed
Date: May 22, 2023Civil Case Cover Sheet, Filed
Date: February 07, 2023Proof of Service - Summons & Complaint, Filed
Date: February 17, 2023Demurrer, Filed
Date: March 20, 2023Notice, Filed
Date: May 24, 2023Case Management Conference
Date: August 14, 2023Summons Issued, Filed
Date: February 07, 2023Notice of Case Assignment/Case Management Conf, Filed
Date: February 09, 2023Notice of Case Assignment/Case Management Conf, Filed
Date: February 22, 202377752JUDIT020f4c
Date: June 21, 202377752DEFEN00ea82
Date: June 21, 202377752SUMMO03a934
Date: June 21, 2023Cross Complaint, Filed
Date: June 21, 202377820DEFEN00d6e6
Date: June 22, 2023Answer to Complaint, Filed
Date: June 21, 2023Summons Issued, Filed
Date: June 21, 2023Cross Complaint, Filed
Date: June 21, 202377918Motio00a999
Date: June 23, 2023Notice of Posting of Jury Fees, Filed
Date: June 22, 2023Motion, Filed
Date: June 23, 20232013-07-17 JONES Opposition to LCI Motion to Strike FAC [Final]
Date: July 18, 20232023-07-20 JONES CMC Statement
Date: July 20, 202379403REPLY0091a8
Date: July 21, 202379561CROSS00d1da
Date: July 25, 202379707CaseM00f6c4
Date: July 27, 202379789CaseM001a31
Date: July 29, 202379920Notic004693
Date: August 01, 20232023-08-09 JONES Second Amended Complaint (Ballard)
Date: August 09, 202380429Notic0065c3
Date: August 10, 202380551Notic008190
Date: August 11, 202380551Proof01451f
Date: August 11, 20232023-11-09 JONES_POS re Stipulation to File 3rd Amended Complaint
Date: November 09, 202382293DEFEN005595
Date: September 07, 202382711DEFEN004866
Date: September 12, 20232023-10-17 JONES Opposition to Motion to Strike SAC
Date: October 17, 202385266REPLY006424
Date: October 24, 202385580CaseM00ce36
Date: October 27, 20232023-11-08 JONES - POS re Stipulation to File 3rd Amended Complaint
Date: November 08, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 15, 2024 | Docket Event | 94039Cross02a7ab | |
March 15, 2024 | Docket Event | 94039ANSWE00be51 | |
March 15, 2024 | Docket Event | 94039NOTIC0340be | |
March 15, 2024 | Docket Event | 94039SUMMO017c07 | |
March 04, 2024 | Tentative Ruling |
Kimberly M. Jones, et al. v. Left Coast Inspections, LLC, et al Case No. 23CV00522 Hearing Date: March 4, 2024 HEARING: Defendant Left Coast Inspections, LLC’s Motion to Strike Portions of Plaintiffs’...
Judge: Judge Colleen K. Sterne |
|
March 01, 2024 | Docket Event | 93091CaseM00e1b1 | |
March 01, 2024 | Docket Event | 93038CaseM001f21 | |
March 01, 2024 | Docket Event | 2024-02-29 JONES-4615 CMC Statement | |
February 26, 2024 | Docket Event | 92717REPLY0071f1 | |
February 20, 2024 | Docket Event | 2024-02-20 JONES ROBLADA Opp to LCI MTS Third Amended Complaint |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.