Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Bowen, Daniel, filed a(n) 24: Unlimited Product Liability case represented by Montgomery, Scott Robert, against Depuy Synthes Products, Inc., in the jurisdiction of Sonoma County. This case was filed in Sonoma County Superior Courts with DeMeo, Bradford presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 14, 2023 |
Category24: Unlimited Product Liability |
Last RefreshedNovember 10, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationSonoma County, CA |
|
STATE Notice of Removal
Date: October 20, 2023Bowen - Signed stipulation
Date: November 01, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 22, 2024 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: DeMeo, Bradford |
|
November 01, 2023 | Docket Event | Bowen - Signed stipulation | |
October 20, 2023 | Docket Event | STATE Notice of Removal | |
October 19, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Removal to Federal Court | |
September 14, 2023 | Docket Event | Proof of Service - 30 Days Summons and Complaint | |
September 14, 2023 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet | |
September 14, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Assignment to 1 Judge and Notice of CMC | |
September 14, 2023 | Docket Event | Summons Issued | |
September 14, 2023 | Docket Event |
Complaint Filed DOES 1-20 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.