Case Last Refreshed: 5 days ago
Kenneth Dela Cruz Delos Santos, Kenneth Dela Cruz Delos Santos An Individual, Mary Ann Santiago Delos Santos, Mary Ann Santiago Delos Santos An Individual, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case against Bertha Madrigal, Bertha Madrigal An Individual, Joyce Anne Coe, Joyce Anne Coe An Individual, Samuel Madrigal, (total of 6) See All in the jurisdiction of Monterey County. This case was filed in Monterey County Superior Courts Superior.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 15, 2023 |
CategoryAuto Unlimited (22) |
Last RefreshedApril 29, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationMonterey County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Declaration
Date: December 21, 2023Ntc of E-Serve Addresses
Date: April 23, 2024Jury Demand and Ntc of Jury Fee Deposit
Date: April 23, 2024Answer to Complaint
Date: April 23, 2024Our X-C
Date: April 23, 2024Madrigal_Jury_Demand
Date: April 22, 2024Madrigal_Answer
Date: April 22, 2024Jury_Fees_Mary_Santiago_Delos_Santos_220756_
Date: April 16, 2024Proof_73561
Date: March 27, 2024CMC_Statment_Delos_Santos_220756_2_
Date: March 26, 2024NRA_Delos_Santos_220756_2_
Date: March 26, 2024POS
Date: March 26, 2024Proof_of_Service_
Date: March 26, 2024proof
Date: March 26, 2024Delos_Santos_summons
Date: December 16, 2023delos_Santos_complaint
Date: December 16, 2023Delos_Santos_CCCS
Date: December 16, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 23, 2024 | Docket Event | Ntc of E-Serve Addresses | |
April 23, 2024 | Docket Event | Jury Demand and Ntc of Jury Fee Deposit | |
April 23, 2024 | Docket Event | Answer to Complaint | |
April 23, 2024 | Docket Event | Our X-C | |
April 22, 2024 | Docket Event | Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies) | |
April 22, 2024 | Docket Event | Jury Fee Deposit | |
April 22, 2024 | Docket Event | Madrigal_Jury_Demand | |
April 22, 2024 | Docket Event | Madrigal_Answer | |
April 16, 2024 | Docket Event | Jury Fee Deposit | |
April 16, 2024 | Docket Event | Jury_Fees_Mary_Santiago_Delos_Santos_220756_ |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.