Case Last Refreshed: 3 hours ago
Lindsay Ryan Mccormick, Matthew Gregory Tepas, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Kevin Y. Jacobson, against Hyundai Motor America, A California Corporation, represented by James Patrick Mayo, Jordan A. Willette, Reshma Amarlal Bajaj, Spencer Peter Hugret, in the jurisdiction of Monterey County. This case was filed in Monterey County Superior Courts Superior.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 16, 2023 |
CategoryBreach Of Contract/Warranty Unlimited (06) |
Last RefreshedApril 27, 2024 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationMonterey County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
SF195535 DECLARATION
Date: March 22, 2024SF195535 Reply_ISO_
Date: March 22, 202494424Notic0099fd
Date: March 21, 202494162Decla029aaa
Date: March 19, 202494162Reque0311d8
Date: March 19, 202494162Oppos00d5ed
Date: March 19, 202494162Decla01601c
Date: March 19, 2024SF188359 CMS
Date: February 09, 2024DECL ISO MTC ARB
Date: February 01, 2024MPA ISO MTC ARB
Date: February 01, 2024NOTICE OF MTC ARB
Date: February 01, 202401.31.24 Tepas Matthew et al v HMA NPJF
Date: January 31, 202401.31.24 Tepas Matthew et al v HMA CMS
Date: January 31, 2024SF175429. Answer
Date: November 15, 2023Tepas Matthew Gregory Complaint
Date: October 17, 2023Tepas Matthew Gregory CCCS
Date: October 17, 2023Tepas Matthew Gregory - Summons
Date: October 17, 2023Tepas Matthew Gregory - Peremptory
Date: October 18, 2023(28584542) Affidavit
Date: October 25, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 26, 2024 | Docket Event | 23CV003338 | |
March 29, 2024 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
March 28, 2024 | Docket Event | Tentative Ruling | |
March 22, 2024 | Docket Event | Reply | |
March 22, 2024 | Docket Event | SF195535 DECLARATION | |
March 22, 2024 | Docket Event | SF195535 Reply_ISO_ | |
March 21, 2024 | Docket Event | 94424Notic0099fd | |
March 19, 2024 | Docket Event | 94162Decla029aaa | |
March 19, 2024 | Docket Event | 94162Reque0311d8 | |
March 19, 2024 | Docket Event | 94162Oppos00d5ed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.