Case Last Refreshed: 18 hours ago
Carrie Griffin, Kathleen Hannah, Peter John Curatolo, filed a(n) General Property - Property case represented by Leigh Rodriguez, against Diane Leonard, Michael Leonard, represented by Steve J Andre, in the jurisdiction of Monterey County. This case was filed in Monterey County Superior Courts Superior.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 05, 2023 |
CategoryOther Real Property Unlimited (26) |
Last RefreshedMay 02, 2024 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationMonterey County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
curatololetter4-30-24
Date: April 30, 2024curatolo19proofofservice
Date: April 30, 2024curatoloqtamendednotoicetocompel
Date: April 22, 2024curatoloqtcompelexhibits
Date: April 22, 2024curatoloqtmotiontocompel
Date: April 22, 2024curatololeonardsummonsonamendedcomplaint
Date: April 18, 2024curatololeonardamendedcomplaint
Date: April 18, 2024curatoloexecutedstipulationandorder
Date: April 04, 2024curatoloqtcms
Date: March 15, 2024curatoloqtamendednotice
Date: March 08, 2024curatoloquiettitlemotiontoamend
Date: March 07, 2024curatolosupplementaldeclaration
Date: January 16, 2024curatolohannahdeclarationquiettitle
Date: January 12, 2024GriffinvLeonardMtnREPLY_2
Date: January 12, 2024curatolodaltondeclaration
Date: January 12, 2024GriffinvLeonardCMS
Date: December 29, 2023curatolocms
Date: December 14, 2023curatolorequestforjudicialnotice
Date: December 14, 2023curatololeonardcomplaint
Date: September 05, 2023curatololeonardccfs
Date: September 05, 2023curatololeonardsummons
Date: September 05, 2023curatoloproofofservicediane
Date: October 02, 2023curatoloproofofservicemichael
Date: October 02, 2023GriffinvLeonardPs_As_2
Date: October 10, 2023GriffinvLeonardML_dec_2
Date: October 10, 2023GriffinvLeonardPTC_dec_2
Date: October 10, 2023GriffinvLeonardDL_dec_2
Date: October 10, 2023GriffinvLeonardNtcMtn_2
Date: October 10, 2023GriffinvLeonardSJAdec_2
Date: October 10, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 30, 2024 | Docket Event | curatololetter4-30-24 | |
April 30, 2024 | Docket Event | curatolo19proofofservice | |
April 22, 2024 | Docket Event | Exhibit List (Party) | |
April 22, 2024 | Docket Event | curatoloqtamendednotoicetocompel | |
April 22, 2024 | Docket Event | curatoloqtcompelexhibits | |
April 22, 2024 | Docket Event | curatoloqtmotiontocompel | |
April 22, 2024 | Docket Event | Motion | |
April 18, 2024 | Docket Event | Complaint: Amended | |
April 18, 2024 | Docket Event | curatololeonardsummonsonamendedcomplaint | |
April 18, 2024 | Docket Event | curatololeonardamendedcomplaint |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.