Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago
Academy Mortgage Corporation, filed a(n) General Arbitration - Arbitration case against Alex Salmoun, in the jurisdiction of Monterey County. This case was filed in Monterey County Superior Courts Superior.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 18, 2023 |
CategoryPetition Re:Arbitration Award Unlimited (11) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 27, 2024 |
Practice AreaArbitration |
Filing LocationMonterey County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Arbitration |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Judgment
Date: February 20, 2024Objection_to_Respondent_y_Petition_to_Vacate
Date: November 20, 2023Cover_Sheet_2
Date: July 18, 2023ADR_106_PETITION_TO_CONF_Dispute_Resolution_
Date: July 18, 20232023_0801_Proof_of_Service
Date: August 04, 2023Notice_of_Remote_Appearance
Date: November 06, 2023Case_Management_Statement
Date: November 06, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 20, 2024 | Docket Event | Judgment | |
February 09, 2024 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
November 21, 2023 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
November 20, 2023 | Docket Event | Opposition/Objections | |
November 20, 2023 | Docket Event | Objection_to_Respondent_y_Petition_to_Vacate | |
November 09, 2023 | Docket Event | Proof of Service | |
November 06, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Remote Appearance | |
November 06, 2023 | Docket Event | Statement: Case Management Conference | |
November 06, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice_of_Remote_Appearance | |
November 06, 2023 | Docket Event | Case_Management_Statement |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.