Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Aspire General Insurance Company, A Corporation, filed a(n) Insurance Coverage - Insurance case represented by Brian Philip Tapper, against Jason Martinez, Veronica Martinez, in the jurisdiction of Monterey County. This case was filed in Monterey County Superior Courts Superior.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 16, 2023 |
CategoryInsurance Coverage Unlimited (18) |
Last RefreshedAugust 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaInsurance |
Filing LocationMonterey County, CA |
Matter TypeInsurance Coverage |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
20230700996_CCCS
Date: July 16, 202320230700996_SUM
Date: July 16, 202320230700996_COM
Date: July 16, 2023600-1074xx(1)
Date: July 29, 202311_23749365
Date: August 30, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 30, 2023 | Docket Event | ||
July 31, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice: Settlement Conditional All Parties | |
July 29, 2023 | Docket Event | 600-1074xx(1) | |
July 17, 2023 | Docket Event | Summons: Issued/Filed | |
July 17, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Judicial Assignment and CMC | |
July 17, 2023 | Docket Event | Complaint Filed | |
July 17, 2023 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet | |
July 16, 2023 | Docket Event | 20230700996_CCCS | |
July 16, 2023 | Docket Event | 20230700996_SUM | |
July 16, 2023 | Docket Event | 20230700996_COM |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.