Case Last Refreshed: 3 weeks ago
Santander Bank, filed a(n) General Property - Property case represented by Nicolas Matayron, against California Franchise Tax Board, A Governmental Entity, Cynthia H. Brown, An Individual In Her Individual Capacity And As Trustee For The Rocco M. And Cynthia H. Brown 1998 Revocable Family Trust Established January 6, 1988, Monterey One Water Fka Monterey Regional Water Pollution Control Agency, A Public Agency, Monterey Peninsula Regional Park District, A Public Agency, Rocco M. Brown, An Individual In His Individual Capacity And As Trustee For The Rocco M. And Cynthia H. Brown 1998 Revocable Family Trust Established January 6, 1988, (total of 5) See All represented by Jennifer Nicole Hermann, Michele Thompson, in the jurisdiction of Monterey County. This case was filed in Monterey County Superior Courts Superior.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 27, 2023 |
CategoryOther Real Property Unlimited (26) |
Last RefreshedApril 02, 2024 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationMonterey County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
This complaint is filed by Santander Bank against various defendants. The plaintiff, Santander Bank, is a financial entity authorized to do business in the State of California and holds a security interest in a property located at 402 Monroe Street, ...
Brown - Request for Dismissal (final)
Date: March 26, 2024Brown - Declaration re OSC 03.08.24
Date: March 05, 2024Brown - CMC Statement 12'26'23
Date: December 11, 2023Brown - Complaint
Date: June 27, 2023Brown - Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: June 27, 2023Brown - Summons
Date: June 27, 2023OC141201
Date: July 19, 2023OC140585
Date: July 19, 2023OC140585A
Date: July 19, 20231 OC141489_POS
Date: July 20, 20232 OC141489_POS
Date: July 20, 20231 OC141706_POS
Date: July 22, 2023DISCLAIMER
Date: July 21, 20232 OC141706_POS
Date: July 22, 2023OC141171
Date: July 25, 2023OC141172
Date: July 25, 2023Request for Default - Monterey One
Date: September 20, 2023Request for Default - Monterey Peninsula
Date: September 20, 2023Brown - CMC Statement
Date: October 16, 2023Request for Default - FTB
Date: October 17, 2023RA-010 NOTICE OF REMOTE APPEARANCE
Date: November 08, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 26, 2024 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal: Full | |
March 26, 2024 | Docket Event | Brown - Request for Dismissal (final) | |
March 21, 2024 | Docket Event | Notice | |
March 19, 2024 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
March 05, 2024 | Docket Event | Declaration | |
March 05, 2024 | Docket Event | Brown - Declaration re OSC 03.08.24 | |
December 26, 2023 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
December 11, 2023 | Docket Event | Statement: Case Management Conference | |
December 11, 2023 | Docket Event | Brown - CMC Statement 12'26'23 | |
November 08, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Remote Appearance |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.