Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Mercury Insurance Company, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Nivinskus, Mark Robert, against Campos, David, in the jurisdiction of Napa County. This case was filed in Napa County Superior Courts Superior with Cynthia Pillsbury Smith presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCynthia Pillsbury Smith Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 12, 2023 |
CategoryAuto Limited (22) - Under 10,000 |
Last RefreshedJanuary 27, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNapa County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 21, 2024 | Docket Event |
Conference: Case Management
Judge: Smith, Cynthia P |
|
January 22, 2024 | Docket Event | Judgment | |
January 18, 2024 | Docket Event | Stipulation for Entry of Judgment | |
December 13, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing Court | |
December 12, 2023 | Docket Event | Complaint (Limited): Up to $10K | |
December 12, 2023 | Docket Event |
Summons: Issued and Filed Summons |
|
December 12, 2023 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.