Case Last Refreshed: 1 week ago
Lyla Waggenheim, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Sumangala Bhattacharya, against Monterey Plaza Hotel Limited Partnership, represented by Edward Douglas Baldwin, in the jurisdiction of Monterey County. This case was filed in Monterey County Superior Courts Superior.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 19, 2023 |
CategoryOther Pi/Pd/Wd Unlimited (23) |
Last RefreshedApril 22, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationMonterey County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
petition.approve.ver2
Date: April 15, 2024minorpetition.attach14a.final
Date: April 12, 2024attachment9
Date: April 12, 2024PETITION TO APPROVE
Date: April 12, 2024minor.petition.final
Date: April 02, 2024settlement.notice
Date: February 26, 2024proposed.order.prohacvice
Date: December 04, 2023complaint.final
Date: May 19, 2023Scan2023-05-17_091627
Date: May 19, 2023civilcoversheet4
Date: May 19, 202378208DEFEN002b38
Date: June 29, 202378208PROPO01f567
Date: June 29, 202381506Reply00f2a6
Date: August 25, 2023waggenheim.prohacvice
Date: August 28, 202381827Notic003afa
Date: August 30, 2023RA-010
Date: August 30, 202382236Answe007f52
Date: September 07, 2023case.management.final;
Date: September 11, 202382808Notic006407
Date: September 13, 2023notice.juryfee
Date: September 18, 202383126CaseM008980
Date: September 19, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 15, 2024 | Docket Event | petition.approve.ver2 | |
April 12, 2024 | Docket Event | minorpetition.attach14a.final | |
April 12, 2024 | Docket Event | attachment9 | |
April 12, 2024 | Docket Event | PETITION TO APPROVE | |
April 02, 2024 | Docket Event | minor.petition.final | |
February 28, 2024 | Docket Event | Notice: Settlement Conditional All Parties | |
February 26, 2024 | Docket Event | settlement.notice | |
December 29, 2023 | Docket Event | Order | |
December 04, 2023 | Docket Event | proposed.order.prohacvice | |
November 15, 2023 | Docket Event | Certificate of Mailing |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.