Case Last Refreshed: 3 weeks ago
Carreto, Jany, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Zazzi, Kimberli Charleen, against American Honda Motor Co., Inc., American Honda Motor Co., Inc.; And Does 1-10, represented by Tran, Trang Thi, in the jurisdiction of Napa County. This case was filed in Napa County Superior Courts Superior with Joseph J. Solga presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJoseph J. Solga Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 20, 2023 |
CategoryBreach Of Contract/Warranty Unlimited (06) |
Last RefreshedApril 03, 2024 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationNapa County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Carreto - Signed RFD
Date: March 27, 2024Carreto - Signed NOS
Date: February 16, 202487112Ameri002dba
Date: November 21, 2023PDF Carreto - Summons
Date: October 20, 2023PDF Carreto - Declaration
Date: October 20, 2023PDF Carreto - Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: October 20, 2023PDF Carreto - Complaint
Date: October 20, 2023Unendorsed POSS
Date: October 26, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 01, 2024 | Docket Event |
OSC: Court's Motion to Dismiss
Judge: Solga, Joseph J. |
|
March 29, 2024 | Docket Event |
Conference: Case Management
Judge: Young, Scott R.L. |
|
March 28, 2024 | Docket Event | Restored to Court's Control | |
March 27, 2024 | Docket Event |
Request: Dismissal AS OF ENTIRE ACTION |
|
March 27, 2024 | Docket Event | Carreto - Signed RFD | |
February 16, 2024 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing Court Re: OSC Dismissal |
|
February 16, 2024 | Docket Event | Removed from Court's Control | |
February 16, 2024 | Docket Event | Carreto - Signed NOS | |
February 15, 2024 | Docket Event | Notice: Settlement of Entire Case CONDITIONAL | |
November 21, 2023 | Docket Event | Answer (Unlimited) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.