Case Last Refreshed: 1 month ago
Anderson, Diane Mereida, Gipson, Benjamin Ramon, Jr., filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Lieberman, Richard Michael, against De La Torre, David Reynoso, De La Torre, Jesus Reynoso, in the jurisdiction of Napa County. This case was filed in Napa County Superior Courts Superior with Cynthia Pillsbury Smith presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 13, 2023 |
CategoryAuto Unlimited (22) |
Last RefreshedApril 01, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNapa County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
POS-jesus-de-la-torre-3-21-24
Date: March 25, 2024POS-David-3-8-24
Date: March 22, 2024POS-jesus-3-21-24
Date: March 22, 2024cmc-stmt-3-6-24
Date: March 06, 2024POS-David Reynoso de la Torre
Date: February 15, 2024jury-fee-deposit-11-10-23
Date: November 10, 2023jury-demand-11-10-23
Date: November 10, 2023summons
Date: October 13, 2023complaint-10-12-23
Date: October 13, 2023cover-sheet-10-12-23
Date: October 13, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 21, 2024 | Docket Event |
Conference: Case Management
Judge: Smith, Cynthia P |
|
March 26, 2024 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
March 26, 2024 | Docket Event |
Conference: Case Management
Judge: Smith, Cynthia P |
|
March 25, 2024 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of Summons | |
March 25, 2024 | Docket Event | POS-jesus-de-la-torre-3-21-24 | |
March 22, 2024 | Docket Event | Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil) | |
March 22, 2024 | Docket Event | POS-David-3-8-24 | |
March 22, 2024 | Docket Event | POS-jesus-3-21-24 | |
March 06, 2024 | Docket Event | Statement: Case Management Conference | |
March 06, 2024 | Docket Event | cmc-stmt-3-6-24 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.