Case Last Refreshed: 1 month ago
Davies, Nathaniel, Schurmer, Earl, Schurmer, Rhonda, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Schurmer, Samantha Reese, against Flak, Stephanie, represented by Goldman, Lydia Diane, in the jurisdiction of Napa County. This case was filed in Napa County Superior Courts Superior with Cynthia Pillsbury Smith presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 27, 2023 |
CategoryAuto Unlimited (22) |
Last RefreshedMarch 28, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNapa County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
94475REQUE0077a0
Date: March 22, 202493881NOTIC001be3
Date: March 14, 202492826CaseM00634f
Date: February 28, 2024Schurmer v. Flak DEF CMC Stmt
Date: February 21, 2024Schurmer v. Flak DEF Jury Fees
Date: February 21, 2024Schurmer v. Flak Answer
Date: February 21, 202483658Compl009062
Date: September 27, 202383658Civil023fb0
Date: September 27, 202383658Civil016db2
Date: September 27, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 07, 2025 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial: Long Cause TE: 5-7 Days Judge: Smith, Cynthia P |
|
April 03, 2025 | Docket Event |
Conference: Trial Management
Judge: Smith, Cynthia P |
|
March 06, 2025 | Docket Event | Conference: Mandatory Settlement | |
March 22, 2024 | Docket Event |
Request: Dismissal As to: Plaintiff-Nathaniel Davies |
|
March 22, 2024 | Docket Event | 94475REQUE0077a0 | |
March 14, 2024 | Docket Event | 93881NOTIC001be3 | |
March 13, 2024 | Docket Event | Advance Jury Fee (Nonrefundable) | |
March 07, 2024 | Docket Event |
Conference: Case Management
Judge: Smith, Cynthia P |
|
March 07, 2024 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
February 28, 2024 | Docket Event | 92826CaseM00634f |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.