Case Last Refreshed: 2 hours ago
Ma Armenta Zavala, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Christopher Eric Swanson, Natasha M Wu, against General Motors Llc, A Delaware Limited Liability Company, represented by Cameron M Major, in the jurisdiction of Monterey County. This case was filed in Monterey County Superior Courts Superior.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 06, 2023 |
CategoryBreach Of Contract/Warranty Unlimited (06) |
Last RefreshedApril 28, 2024 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationMonterey County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
96551Notic001938
Date: April 23, 202496488Defen02ba0c
Date: April 22, 202496488Decla011f8b
Date: April 22, 202496488Defen006ca8
Date: April 22, 202494204PLAIN0292cb
Date: March 19, 202494204DECLA018f05
Date: March 19, 202494204PLAIN001fa1
Date: March 19, 202492957Notic00dee2
Date: February 29, 202492574PLAIN006868
Date: February 23, 202492111Decla01a847
Date: February 16, 202492111Defen021264
Date: February 16, 202492111Defen008169
Date: February 16, 202492089Stipu005717
Date: February 15, 202488739DECLA0243a5
Date: December 20, 202388739PLAIN038a22
Date: December 20, 202388739PLAIN01ccea
Date: December 20, 202388739PLAIN00a80c
Date: December 20, 202375151Defen004fa6
Date: May 03, 202377182Armen005ee0
Date: June 09, 202380005CaseM0085ba
Date: August 02, 202380005Notic01d0d0
Date: August 02, 202380058CaseM0064e3
Date: August 03, 202380058Notic0185f4
Date: August 03, 202381617Armen00ddb5
Date: August 28, 202383301CaseM003413
Date: September 21, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 23, 2024 | Docket Event | Notice | |
April 23, 2024 | Docket Event | 96551Notic001938 | |
April 22, 2024 | Docket Event | Declaration | |
April 22, 2024 | Docket Event | Statement | |
April 22, 2024 | Docket Event | Opposition/Objections | |
April 22, 2024 | Docket Event | 96488Defen02ba0c | |
April 22, 2024 | Docket Event | 96488Decla011f8b | |
April 22, 2024 | Docket Event | 96488Defen006ca8 | |
March 19, 2024 | Docket Event | Declaration | |
March 19, 2024 | Docket Event | Motion |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.