Case Last Refreshed: 6 days ago
Lucio Lainez, filed a(n) Complex - Other Unlimited case represented by Gregory N Karasik, against United Ag Labor Services, Inc., represented by Todd Christopher Hunt, Vincent Thomas Martinez, in the jurisdiction of Monterey County. This case was filed in Monterey County Superior Courts Superior.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 27, 2023 |
CategoryComplex - Other Unlimited |
Last RefreshedApril 30, 2024 |
|
Filing LocationMonterey County, CA |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Lainez Declaration
Date: April 23, 2024Gomez Declaration
Date: April 23, 2024Karasik Declaration
Date: April 23, 2024Motion for Class Certification
Date: April 23, 2024Memorandum ISO Motion for Class Certification
Date: April 23, 2024Notice of Change of Address
Date: January 23, 2024Joint CMC Statement for 1-23-24
Date: January 16, 2024Joint Case Management Statement
Date: June 02, 2023Notice of Posting Jury Fees.UALS
Date: June 26, 2023Joint CMC Statement for 9-26-23
Date: September 06, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 23, 2024 | Docket Event | Declaration | |
April 23, 2024 | Docket Event | Memorandum: Points and Authorities | |
April 23, 2024 | Docket Event | Motion | |
April 23, 2024 | Docket Event | Lainez Declaration | |
April 23, 2024 | Docket Event | Gomez Declaration | |
April 23, 2024 | Docket Event | Karasik Declaration | |
April 23, 2024 | Docket Event | Motion for Class Certification | |
April 23, 2024 | Docket Event | Memorandum ISO Motion for Class Certification | |
January 24, 2024 | Docket Event | Notice | |
January 23, 2024 | Docket Event | Notice: Change Address/Firm Name |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.