Case Last Refreshed: 2 weeks ago
Hawkins Hall, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Ann Hung Phoong, against Pacifica Hotel Pacific Lp, represented by Marla Grace Ness, in the jurisdiction of Monterey County. This case was filed in Monterey County Superior Courts Superior.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 19, 2023 |
CategoryOther Pi/Pd/Wd Unlimited (23) |
Last RefreshedApril 14, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationMonterey County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Hawkins Hall Signed and Filed MC350_MC351
Date: April 11, 2024Hawkins Hall Signed and Filed CIV010_011
Date: April 11, 2024Notice of Settlement - Hall att Signed
Date: February 14, 2024complaint
Date: January 19, 2023case cover sheet
Date: January 19, 2023summons
Date: January 20, 2023not endorsed POS
Date: February 21, 202371567Answe00dc58
Date: February 28, 2023CMC Statement - Hawkins Hall
Date: May 03, 2023OC132578
Date: May 08, 2023DemandforJuryandNtcofPosting
Date: May 17, 2023CMS
Date: July 26, 2023PacificasCaseMgmtStmnt
Date: July 27, 2023Hall August 15 2023 (1)
Date: July 31, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 11, 2024 | Docket Event | Hawkins Hall Signed and Filed MC350_MC351 | |
April 11, 2024 | Docket Event | Hawkins Hall Signed and Filed CIV010_011 | |
February 14, 2024 | Docket Event | Notice of Settlement - Hall att Signed | |
August 25, 2023 | Docket Event | Certificate of Mailing | |
August 15, 2023 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
July 31, 2023 | Docket Event | Statement: Case Management Conference | |
July 31, 2023 | Docket Event | Hall August 15 2023 (1) | |
July 27, 2023 | Docket Event | PacificasCaseMgmtStmnt | |
July 27, 2023 | Docket Event | Statement: Case Management Conference | |
July 26, 2023 | Docket Event | CMS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.