Case Last Refreshed: 2 weeks ago
filed a(n) 42: Unlimited Other Complaint (Not Spec) case in the jurisdiction of Shasta County. This case was filed in Shasta County Superior Courts Superior with Baker, Stephen H presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 18, 2023 |
Category42: Unlimited Other Complaint (Not Spec) |
Last RefreshedApril 16, 2024 |
|
Filing LocationShasta County, CA |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 13, 2024 | Hearing |
*Trial: Court
Judge: Baker, Stephen H |
|
September 16, 2024 | Hearing |
*Settlement Conference
Judge: Baker, Stephen H |
|
April 15, 2024 | Hearing |
*Review
Judge: Baker, Stephen H |
|
April 15, 2024 | Hearing |
*Demurrer/Motion to Strike
Judge: Baker, Stephen H |
|
April 08, 2024 | Docket Event | Reply Filed | |
March 25, 2024 | Hearing |
*Review
Judge: Baker, Stephen H |
|
March 11, 2024 | Docket Event | Documents Received | |
March 11, 2024 | Docket Event | Memorandum of Points & Authorities | |
March 11, 2024 | Docket Event | Declaration in Support | |
March 11, 2024 | Docket Event | Demurrer |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.