Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Spring Oaks Capital Spv, Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Karayan, Sarkis S, against Rodriguez, Ismael, in the jurisdiction of Merced County. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts Superior with TBA, Judge presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTBA, Judge Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 04, 2023 |
Category(09): Limited Rule 3.740 Coll $0.01-$7,000.00 B&P Code |
Last RefreshedJuly 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationMerced County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Order Show Cause Dismissal Re: Notice of Settlement
Date: March 05, 2025Summons - Filed
Date: April 04, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 05, 2025 | Docket Event |
Notice of OSC Dismissal Hrg Order Show Cause Dismissal Re: Notice of Settlement Judge: TBA, Judge |
|
April 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of OSC Dismissal Hrg Notice of OSC Dismissal re: Notice of Settlement |
|
April 24, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Settlement | |
April 07, 2023 | Docket Event | Proof of Service Summons | |
April 04, 2023 | Docket Event |
HarrisAndZide_TA080921_sum_eABC Summons - Filed |
|
April 04, 2023 | Docket Event |
HarrisAndZide_TA080921_com_eABC Complaint |
|
April 04, 2023 | Docket Event |
HarrisAndZide_TA080921_ccs_eABC Civil Case Cover Sheet |
|
April 04, 2023 | Docket Event |
HarrisAndZide_TA080921_rfe_eABC Declaration |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.