Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Gonzalez Juan Carlos, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Aynechi H. Dean, against Vera Jose Antonio, Vera Trucking Llc An Arizona Company, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Compton with George F. Bird, Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 10, 2023 |
CategoryMotor Vehicle - Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedJanuary 27, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseCompton |
Alternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-04-10T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-04-10T00:00:00Request for Dismissal; Filed by: JUAN CARLOS GONZALEZ (Plaintiff)
Date: January 09, 2024Notice of Lien; Filed by: JUAN CARLOS GONZALEZ (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-07-27T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by: JUAN CARLOS GONZALEZ (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-08-04T00:00:00First Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-04-10T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-04-10T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-04-13T00:00:00Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-04-10T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-04-10T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: JUAN CARLOS GONZALEZ (Plaintiff)
Date: December 05, 2023Complaint
Date: April 10, 2023Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: April 10, 2023Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: April 10, 2023Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: April 10, 2023Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: April 10, 2023Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet
Date: April 10, 2023Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: April 10, 2023Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET
Date: April 10, 2023For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.