Arredondo An Individual Chris,
filed a(n)
Automobile -
Torts
case
represented by
Azizi Daniel,
Vanderveer Robert Reza,
against
Chow Philip Tse,
Doe John,
in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County.
This case was filed in
Los Angeles County
Superior Courts
Alhambra with Joel L. Lofton presiding.
Case Details for
Arredondo An Individual Chris v. Chow Philip Tse
, et al.
Case Events for
Arredondo An Individual Chris v. Chow Philip Tse
, et al.
Date
Type
Description
March 11, 2024
Hearing
Department X at 150 West Commonwealth, Alhambra, CA 91801 Order to Show Cause Re: Sanctions of $500.00 for Plaintiffs Failure to Serve the Complaint
December 08, 2023
Docket Event
Minute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Sanctions of $500.00 for plaintiff's ...)
December 08, 2023
Hearing
Order to Show Cause Re: Sanctions of $500.00 for plaintiff's failure to serve this matter or file declaration re attempts at service scheduled for in Alhambra Courthouse at Department X updated: Result Date to ; Result Type to Held - Continued
December 08, 2023
Hearing
Order to Show Cause Re: Sanctions of $500.00 for Plaintiffs Failure to Serve the Complaint scheduled for in Alhambra Courthouse at Department X
December 08, 2023
Hearing
Department X at 150 West Commonwealth, Alhambra, CA 91801 Order to Show Cause Re: Sanctions of $500.00 for plaintiff's failure to serve this matter or file declaration re attempts at service
November 20, 2023
Docket Event
Address for DANIEL AZIZI (Attorney) updated
November 17, 2023
Docket Event
Notice of Change of Handling Attorney; Filed by: CHRIS ARREDONDO, AN INDIVIDUAL (Plaintiff); As to: JOHN DOE (Defendant); PHILIP TSE CHOW (Defendant)
October 30, 2023
Docket Event
Proof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: CHRIS ARREDONDO, AN INDIVIDUAL (Plaintiff); As to: PHILIP TSE CHOW (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: ; Service Cost: 136.95; Service Cost Waived: No
October 17, 2023
Docket Event
Minute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Sanctions of $500.00 for plaintiff's ...)
October 17, 2023
Hearing
On the Court's own motion, Order to Show Cause Re: Sanctions of $500.00 for plaintiff's failure to serve this matter or file declaration re attempts at service scheduled for in Alhambra Courthouse at Department X Held - Continued was rescheduled to 08:30 AM