Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
filed a(n) Civil case in the jurisdiction of Penobscot County, ME, . Penobscot County, ME Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 02, 2023 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedDecember 18, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationPenobscot County, ME |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 14, 2023 | Docket Event | Granted | |
December 14, 2023 | Docket Event | Vacated | |
December 13, 2023 | Docket Event | filing document - ANSWER - filed | |
December 11, 2023 | Docket Event | motion - MOTION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT JUDGMENT - filed | |
December 08, 2023 | Docket Event | order - ENTRY OF DEFAULT - entered | |
December 08, 2023 | Docket Event | motion - AFF & REQUEST FOR DEFAULT/DEFAULT JUDG - filed | |
November 27, 2023 | Docket Event | responsive pleading - ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSE - filed | |
November 27, 2023 | Docket Event | jury filing - DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL - filed | |
November 21, 2023 | Docket Event | service - PROOF OF SERVICE - filed | |
November 02, 2023 | Docket Event | filing document - COMPLAINT - filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.