Case Last Refreshed: 10 months ago
Rodriguez, Debra, filed a(n) Estate Administration - Probate case in the jurisdiction of San Mateo County. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts Superior with Gilbert T. Brown presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 04, 2023 |
CategoryDecedent'S Estate |
Last RefreshedJune 22, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationSan Mateo County, CA |
Matter TypeEstate Administration |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
Letters of Administration Hearing
Judge: Brown, Gilbert |
|
May 15, 2023 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal - Initial Petition - Doc PETITION FOR PROBATE without Prejudice Request for Dismissal - Initial Petition - Doc PETITION FOR PROBATE without Prejudice |
|
April 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
~PRO Minute Order - Letters of Administration Hearing 04/27/2023 Letters of Administration Hearing Judge: Davis, III, Leland |
|
January 18, 2023 | Docket Event |
Proof of Publication of NOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE OF DEANNA MARY SMITH AKA AND/ OR DEE Proof of Publication of NOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE OF DEANNA MARY SMITH AKA AND/ OR DEE SMITH |
|
January 09, 2023 | Docket Event | Duties and Liabilities signed | |
January 09, 2023 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service by Mail of Notice of Petition to Administer Estate Proof of Service by Mail of Notice of Petition to Administer Estate |
|
January 09, 2023 | Docket Event | Confidential Statement of Birthdate & Drivers License signed | |
January 04, 2023 | Docket Event |
Petition for Letters of Administration Petition for Letters of Administration |
|
January 04, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Petition to Administer Estate | |
January 04, 2023 | Docket Event | Court Reporter service less than one hour |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.