Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Ramirez, Ma Araceli, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Santos, Gaudencio, in the jurisdiction of San Mateo County. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts Superior with Holt, Rachel E. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 31, 2023 |
CategoryDissolution W/O Minor Children |
Last RefreshedNovember 15, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationSan Mateo County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 07, 2024 | Docket Event |
Family Law Status Conference
Judge: Padilla, Jr., Rosendo |
|
July 18, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Reassignment for All Purposes | |
May 30, 2023 | Docket Event |
Mail returned undelivered Document: NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT AND JUDGMENT Reason: RETURN TO SENDER-NOT DELIVERABLE AS ADDRESSED |
|
May 15, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Judgment filed and mailed to all parties | |
May 15, 2023 | Docket Event | Judgment of Dissolution Entered | |
April 05, 2023 | Docket Event |
Mail returned undelivered Document: REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT Reason: INSUFFICIENT ADDRESS |
|
March 29, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Rescheduled Hearing | |
March 20, 2023 | Docket Event |
Judgment sent to Judicial Officer for signature
Judge: Cho, Sharon K. |
|
March 17, 2023 | Docket Event | Judgment Received | |
March 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
Declaration for Default or Uncontested Dissolution or Legal Separation |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.