Case Last Refreshed: 1 day ago
Aref Anwar, By And Through His Guardian Ad Litem Sridevi Anwar, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Brandi, Thomas J., against County Of San Mateo, Does 1 Through 10, Inclusive, Estate Of Daniel Ryan Craig, in the jurisdiction of San Mateo County. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts Superior with Healy, Nicole S. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHealy, Nicole S. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 22, 2023 |
Category(22) Unlimited Auto |
Last RefreshedApril 26, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSan Mateo County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
This document is a comprehensive summary of a legal case and the medical treatment of a patient involved in a motor vehicle accident. The accident occurred on State Route 35 in San Mateo County, California, on December 29, 2022. The driver lost contr...
96562Propo012c3d
Date: April 23, 202496562Reply002498
Date: April 23, 2024PROPOSED ORDER COVER SHEET
Date: April 23, 2024Declaration in Support
Date: March 04, 2024Proof of Service - ELECTRONIC of
Date: April 16, 2024Complaint
Date: December 22, 2023Affidavit of Mailing
Date: January 03, 2024Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Reply
Date: April 23, 2024Proof of Service by SUBSTITUTED SERVICE of
Date: March 08, 2024Summons Issued / Filed
Date: December 22, 2023Substitution of Attorney as to
Date: March 28, 2024Petition
Date: March 04, 2024Proposed Order Received
Date: April 23, 2024Proof of Service by MAIL of
Date: March 06, 2024Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support
Date: March 04, 2024Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: December 22, 2023Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of
Date: March 26, 2024Notice
Date: March 04, 2024Notice of Assignment for All Purposes
Date: December 22, 2023Declaration in Support
Date: March 04, 2024Non-Opposition to
Date: April 16, 2024Application and Order for Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem
Date: January 03, 2024Proof of Service
Date: April 16, 202420240416 Anwar_Non-Opposition to P's Petition for Relief from GC 945.4 v3
Date: April 16, 202494908Subst00857f
Date: March 29, 202494691Proof008c9e
Date: March 26, 202494725SUBST001a67
Date: March 27, 202493513Proof00311d
Date: March 08, 202493343Proof00974c
Date: March 06, 202493191Decla0439b4
Date: March 05, 202493191Decla03f21c
Date: March 05, 202493191Petit02740f
Date: March 05, 202493191Notic01959e
Date: March 05, 202493191Memor00f69f
Date: March 05, 202488856Summo02c75f
Date: December 22, 202388856Petit036c0a
Date: December 22, 202388856Compl000780
Date: December 22, 202388856Civil013a72
Date: December 22, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 26, 2060 | Docket Event | ||
May 23, 2024 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Mau, Michael L. |
|
May 01, 2024 | Docket Event |
Petition for Approval PETITION FOR ORDER RELIEVING PETITIONER FROMPROVISIONS OF GOVT. CODE 945.4 Judge: Healy, Nicole S. |
|
April 23, 2024 | Docket Event | 96562Propo012c3d | |
April 23, 2024 | Docket Event | 96562Reply002498 | |
April 23, 2024 | Docket Event | PROPOSED ORDER COVER SHEET | |
April 23, 2024 | Docket Event |
Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Reply IN SUPPORT OF PETITIONFOR ORDER RELIEVINGPETITIONER Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Reply IN SUPPORT OF PETITION FOR ORDER RELIEVING PETITIONER FROM PROVISIONS OF GOVT. CODE 945.4 |
|
April 23, 2024 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Received [PROPOSED] ORDER ON PETITIONFOR ORDER RELIEVINGPETITIONER FROM PROVISIONS Proposed Order Received [PROPOSED] ORDER ON PETITION FOR ORDER RELIEVING PETITIONER FROM PROVISIONS OF GOVT. CODE 945.4 |
|
April 16, 2024 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service - ELECTRONIC of STATE OF CALIFORNIA'S NON-OPPOSITION TO PETITION FOR ORDER RELIEV Proof of Service - ELECTRONIC of STATE OF CALIFORNIA'S NON-OPPOSITION TO PETITION FOR ORDER RELIEVING PETITIONER FROM PROVISIONS OF GOVT. CODE 945.4 |
|
April 16, 2024 | Docket Event |
Non-Opposition to NON-OPPOSITION TO PETITION FOR ORDER RELIEVING PETITIONER FROM PROVISIONS OF GOVT. NON-OPPOSITION TO PETITION FOR ORDER RELIEVING PETITIONER FROM PROVISIONS OF GOVT. CODE 945.4 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.