Case Last Refreshed: 1 month ago
Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Kaiser Permanente Insurance Corporation, The Permanente Medical Group, Inc., filed a(n) (43) Unlimited Other Petition (Not Spec) case against Ibarra, Alejandro, in the jurisdiction of San Mateo County. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts Superior with Weiner, Marie S. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 06, 2023 |
Category(43) Unlimited Other Petition (Not Spec) |
Last RefreshedApril 02, 2024 |
|
Filing LocationSan Mateo County, CA |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
SF34028901
Date: April 01, 202420240319164619
Date: March 19, 2024FOR_COURT_USE_ONLY
Date: March 08, 2024N
Date: March 08, 2024ATTORNEY_OR_PARTY_WITHOUT_ATTORNEY
Date: March 08, 2024EFS_020
Date: March 08, 2024ATTORNEY_OR_PARTY_WITHOUT_ATTORNEY
Date: February 20, 2024ATTORNEY_OR_PARTY_WITHOUT_ATTORNEY_2
Date: February 20, 2024EFS_020
Date: February 20, 2024SF34023860
Date: December 27, 2023CCCS
Date: November 06, 2023POS
Date: November 06, 2023NTC
Date: November 06, 2023PET
Date: November 06, 2023DEC
Date: November 06, 2023MPA
Date: November 06, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 02, 2060 | Docket Event | ||
April 01, 2024 | Docket Event | SF34028901 | |
March 19, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
March 08, 2024 | Docket Event | FOR_COURT_USE_ONLY | |
March 08, 2024 | Docket Event | N | |
March 08, 2024 | Docket Event | ATTORNEY_OR_PARTY_WITHOUT_ATTORNEY | |
March 08, 2024 | Docket Event | EFS_020 | |
February 20, 2024 | Docket Event | ATTORNEY_OR_PARTY_WITHOUT_ATTORNEY | |
February 20, 2024 | Docket Event | ATTORNEY_OR_PARTY_WITHOUT_ATTORNEY_2 | |
February 20, 2024 | Docket Event | EFS_020 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.