Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Gates, Diane V., filed a(n) (02) Unlimited Writ Of Mandate case against Director, Department Of Motor Vehicles, in the jurisdiction of San Mateo County. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts Superior with Weiner, Marie S. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 03, 2023 |
Category(02) Unlimited Writ Of Mandate |
Last RefreshedNovember 11, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationSan Mateo County, CA |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Notice of Hearing re: Writ of Mandamus/Mandate
Date: November 06, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 03, 2024 | Docket Event |
Petition for Writ of Mandate
Judge: Weiner, Marie S. |
|
January 02, 2024 | Docket Event |
Case Management and Trial Setting Conference
Judge: Weiner, Marie S. |
|
November 06, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing re: Writ of Mandamus/Mandate NOTICE OF MOTION FOR WRIT OF ADMINISTRATIVE MANDAMUS Notice of Hearing re: Writ of Mandamus/Mandate NOTICE OF MOTION FOR WRIT OF ADMINISTRATIVE MANDAMUS (CCP 1094.5) |
|
November 03, 2023 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet | |
November 03, 2023 | Docket Event | Petition | |
November 03, 2023 | Docket Event | Cause Of Action | |
November 03, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Assignment for All Purposes | |
November 03, 2023 | Docket Event |
Fee Waiver Granted Signed by CLERK HESSEN on 11/03/2023 Fee Waiver Granted Signed by CLERK HESSEN on 11/03/2023 |
|
November 03, 2023 | Docket Event | Request to Waive Court Fees | |
November 03, 2023 | Docket Event | New Filed Case |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.