Case Last Refreshed: 1 week ago
Saad Mir, On Behalf Of Himself, filed a(n) Complex Civil Unlimited case represented by Jupillat, Nicolas, against Does 1 Through 100, Inclusive, Go Maps, Inc., Pomplun, Kevin, represented by Munoz, William A, in the jurisdiction of San Mateo County. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts Superior with Fineman, Nancy L. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 25, 2023 |
CategoryComplex Civil Unlimited |
Last RefreshedApril 26, 2024 |
|
Filing LocationSan Mateo County, CA |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
This complaint is brought by Plaintiff Saad Mir against his former employers, Go Maps, Inc. and Kevin Pomplun, as well as other unidentified defendants. The complaint alleges several violations, including willful misclassification of employees, failu...
Summons Issued / Filed
Date: October 25, 2023First Amended Complaint
Date: January 17, 2024Proof of Service - ELECTRONIC of
Date: February 14, 2024Complaint
Date: October 25, 2023Proof of Service - ELECTRONIC of
Date: March 26, 2024Notice of Assignment for All Purposes
Date: October 25, 2023Proof of Service - ELECTRONIC of
Date: January 17, 2024Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: October 25, 2023Case Management Order
Date: February 05, 2024Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: February 05, 2024Notice of Posting Jury Fees
Date: March 28, 2024Notice
Date: February 14, 2024Affidavit of Mailing
Date: February 05, 2024Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of
Date: February 14, 2024Proof of Service by MAIL of
Date: December 26, 2023Proof of Service - ELECTRONIC of
Date: March 28, 2024Proof of Service by MAIL of
Date: February 14, 2024Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of
Date: October 30, 2023Case Management Statement
Date: March 26, 202495137DEFEN005485
Date: April 02, 202495000Answe00f573
Date: March 30, 2024POS Ntc of Posting Jury Fees
Date: March 28, 2024Ntc of Posting Jury Fees
Date: March 28, 2024CMCS
Date: March 26, 2024POS CMCS
Date: March 26, 2024POS Complex Fees Go Maps
Date: February 15, 2024Ntc of Payment of Complex Fees
Date: February 15, 2024POS Complex Fees Kevin Pomplun
Date: February 15, 2024POS Prs Svc re FAC
Date: February 14, 2024POS Prs Svc
Date: February 12, 2024POS Complex Design CMC to Kevin Pomplun
Date: February 09, 2024POS Refiled FAC Kevin Pomplun
Date: January 18, 2024FAC
Date: January 18, 2024POS Cert Mail re FAC - Kevin Pomplun
Date: January 11, 2024FAC
Date: January 11, 2024POS Cert Mail Pleadings to Kevin Pomplun
Date: December 26, 2023Summons
Date: October 25, 2023CCCS
Date: October 25, 2023POS of Summons (Go Maps)
Date: October 30, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 26, 2060 | Docket Event | ||
June 11, 2024 | Docket Event |
Complex Case Management Conference
Judge: Fineman, Nancy L. |
|
April 04, 2024 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Mau, Michael L. |
|
April 02, 2024 | Docket Event |
Answer (Unlimited) Answer |
|
April 02, 2024 | Docket Event | 95137DEFEN005485 | |
April 02, 2024 | Docket Event |
Complex Case Management Conference
Judge: Fineman, Nancy L. |
|
March 30, 2024 | Docket Event | 95000Answe00f573 | |
March 29, 2024 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Management Conference CONTINUED TO 6/11/2024 AT 9:30 AM |
|
March 28, 2024 | Docket Event | Notice of Posting Jury Fees | |
March 28, 2024 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service - ELECTRONIC of NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES served on SEE SERVICE LIST Proof of Service - ELECTRONIC of NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES served on SEE SERVICE LIST |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.