Case Last Refreshed: 4 days ago
Panjwani, Mahmood, filed a(n) (02) Unlimited Writ Of Mandate case against County Of San Mateo, Peninsula Humane Society & Spca, Program Manager Of Animcal Control And Licensing, San Mateo County Health Pulic Health, Policy & Planning, Town Of Hillsborough, (total of 5) See All represented by Gin, Joanna, Lopez, Andrew E., in the jurisdiction of San Mateo County. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts Superior with Swope, V presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 27, 2023 |
Category(02) Unlimited Writ Of Mandate |
Last RefreshedApril 26, 2024 |
|
Filing LocationSan Mateo County, CA |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
This complaint involves a legal case concerning conflicts between State and Local law regarding the classification of a dog as "vicious". The California Food & Agriculture Code defines a "vicious" dog as one that unprovoked, in an aggressive manner, ...
Case Management and Trial Setting Conference
Date: December 01, 2023Statement
Date: March 20, 2024Amended Notice Of
Date: March 08, 2024Notice of Case Management and Trial Setting Conference
Date: December 13, 2023Answer (Unlimited)
Date: December 22, 2023Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: September 28, 2023Notice
Date: February 26, 2024Answer (Unlimited)
Date: April 10, 2024Notice of Assignment for All Purposes
Date: September 28, 2023Notice
Date: March 21, 2024Case Management and Trial Setting Conference
Date: February 23, 2024Petition for Writ of Mandate
Date: September 28, 2023Dismissal POS
Date: April 23, 2024Hillsborough-Panjwani-Ans to Petition for Writ
Date: April 10, 2024Hillsborough-Panjwani-Nt of Lodging
Date: March 21, 2024Hillsborough-Panjwani-Statement
Date: March 20, 2024Hillsborough-Panjwani Mahmood-Proposed Order
Date: March 20, 2024Hillsborough-Panjwani-Am Nt of Ruling CMC
Date: March 08, 2024Objection to NOR.AMENDED.3.5.24.
Date: March 05, 2024Objection to NOR 3.4.24
Date: March 04, 2024Hillsborough - Panjwani - Notice of Ruling
Date: February 26, 2024Hillsborough-Panjwani-Answer to Writ
Date: December 22, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 26, 2060 | Docket Event | ||
June 03, 2024 | Docket Event |
Petition for Writ of Mandate
Judge: Swope, V. Raymond |
|
April 24, 2024 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal | |
April 24, 2024 | Docket Event |
Request For Dismissal Partial (for multiple parties) Without Prejudice AS TO PENINSULA HUMANE SOCIET Request For Dismissal Partial (for multiple parties) Without Prejudice AS TO PENINSULA HUMANE SOCIETY ONLY |
|
April 23, 2024 | Docket Event | Dismissal POS | |
April 10, 2024 | Docket Event |
Answer (Unlimited) Answer TO PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA CODE OF CIVIL PROCE Answer (Unlimited) Answer TO PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE SECTION 1094.5, 1094.6 SEEKING JUDICIAL REVIEW OF DECISION OF LOCAL ADMINISTRATIVE AGENCY |
|
April 10, 2024 | Docket Event | Hillsborough-Panjwani-Ans to Petition for Writ | |
March 21, 2024 | Docket Event |
Notice OF LODGING OFCERTIFIED AGENCY FILE Notice OF LODGING OF CERTIFIED AGENCY FILE |
|
March 21, 2024 | Docket Event | Hillsborough-Panjwani-Nt of Lodging | |
March 20, 2024 | Docket Event |
Statement RE RESPONSE TO PROPOSED ORDER Statement RE RESPONSE TO PROPOSED ORDER |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.