Case Last Refreshed: 1 month ago
Lopez Sasan, Patrick John, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Rosenstein, Michael H, against Does 1 Through 10, Inclusive, Tesla, Inc., represented by Ameripour, Ali, in the jurisdiction of San Mateo County. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts Superior with Fineman, Nancy L. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFineman, Nancy L. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 20, 2023 |
Category(06) Unlimited Breach Of Contract/Warranty |
Last RefreshedMarch 26, 2024 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSan Mateo County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
This complaint alleges violations of the Song-Beverly Act by Tesla, Inc. The plaintiff, Patrick John Lopez Sasan, purchased a 2022 Tesla Model 3 with serious defects and nonconformities to warranty. The complaint asserts three causes of action, inclu...
AA Dec
Date: March 26, 2024Reply
Date: March 26, 202424.03.19 Sasan Opp MTC Arb (SD Rev)
Date: March 19, 202424.01.17 Sasan CMS
Date: January 17, 2024Complaint
Date: September 20, 2023Notice of Motion and Motion to Compel
Date: October 23, 2023Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of
Date: September 25, 2023Proposed Order Received
Date: October 23, 202323.09.20 Sasan Complaint
Date: September 20, 202323.09.12 Sasan Summons
Date: September 20, 202323.09.20 Sasan Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: September 20, 2023MTC Arb RK Dec
Date: October 24, 2023MTC Arb Proposed Order
Date: October 24, 2023MTC Arb AA Dec
Date: October 24, 2023MTC ARB
Date: October 24, 2023MTC Arb RJN
Date: October 24, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 26, 2060 | Docket Event | ||
April 02, 2024 | Docket Event |
Motion to Compel DEFENDANT TESLA, INC. S NOTICE OFMOTION AND MOTION TO COMPELBINDING ARBITRATION;MEMORANDUM OF POINTS ANDAUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT Judge: Fineman, Nancy L. |
|
March 26, 2024 | Docket Event | AA Dec | |
March 26, 2024 | Docket Event | Reply | |
March 19, 2024 | Docket Event | 24.03.19 Sasan Opp MTC Arb (SD Rev) | |
February 08, 2024 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Mau, Michael L. |
|
January 17, 2024 | Docket Event | 24.01.17 Sasan CMS | |
January 17, 2024 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement | |
November 14, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Case Management Conference | |
October 24, 2023 | Docket Event | MTC Arb RK Dec |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.