Case Last Refreshed: 2 weeks ago
Michel Aka Jean Michel , John, Michel, John, Michel, Paul, Michel, Yvette, filed a(n) General Property - Property case represented by Finkelstein, David G., against 1 Through 50, Inclusive, Does, Does 1 Through 50, Inclusive, Sullivan Aka Kathleen Sullivan Michel, Kathleen, Sullivan, Kathleen, in the jurisdiction of San Mateo County. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts Superior with Weiner, Marie S. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 21, 2023 |
Category(26) Unlimited Other Real Property |
Last RefreshedApril 17, 2024 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationSan Mateo County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
This complaint is filed by Yvette Michel, Paul Michel, and John Michel (also known as Jean Michel) against Kathleen Sullivan (also known as Kathleen Sullivan Michel) and Does 1 through 50. The plaintiffs are individuals residing and/or doing business...
96087Notic0003ae
Date: April 16, 202494062Proof00cd78
Date: March 16, 202493765Proof04c3d0
Date: March 12, 202493765Memor01cb1e
Date: March 12, 202493673Propo030480
Date: March 11, 202493673Decla02177d
Date: March 11, 202493673Motio01986c
Date: March 11, 202493673Motio005e15
Date: March 11, 202493977Proof00a0dd
Date: March 15, 202493673Proof04efb5
Date: March 11, 202491135Stipu009534
Date: February 01, 202490690Proof01e1a7
Date: January 25, 202490690CaseM001c97
Date: January 25, 202489890CaseM008fb3
Date: January 12, 2024Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: July 22, 2023Complaint
Date: July 22, 2023Summons
Date: July 22, 2023Lis Pendens
Date: July 22, 202379755Proof00c01f
Date: July 28, 202381889Answe00bfd1
Date: August 31, 202381889Proof01b451
Date: August 31, 2023Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of
Date: July 28, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 16, 2024 | Docket Event | 96087Notic0003ae | |
March 16, 2024 | Docket Event | 94062Proof00cd78 | |
March 15, 2024 | Docket Event | 93977Proof00a0dd | |
March 12, 2024 | Docket Event | 93765Proof04c3d0 | |
March 12, 2024 | Docket Event | 93765Memor01cb1e | |
March 11, 2024 | Docket Event | 93673Propo030480 | |
March 11, 2024 | Docket Event | 93673Decla02177d | |
March 11, 2024 | Docket Event | 93673Motio01986c | |
March 11, 2024 | Docket Event | 93673Motio005e15 | |
March 11, 2024 | Docket Event | 93673Proof04efb5 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.