Case Last Refreshed: 1 month ago
Save Our Highlands, An Unincorporated Association, filed a(n) (02) Unlimited Writ Of Mandate case against The County Of San Mateo, A Public Entity, The County Of San Mateo Planning Commission, A Public Entity, The Planning Building Department Of The County Of San Mateo, in the jurisdiction of San Mateo County. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts Superior with Healy, Nicole S. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHealy, Nicole S. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 07, 2023 |
Category(02) Unlimited Writ Of Mandate |
Last RefreshedMarch 27, 2024 |
|
Filing LocationSan Mateo County, CA |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
This complaint is a verified petition for a peremptory writ of mandate/mandamus and a complaint for declaratory relief filed by Save Our Highlands, an unincorporated association, against the County of San Mateo, the County of San Mateo Planning Commi...
Stip re Cont
Date: March 26, 2024Stipulation & Order
Date: December 04, 2023Case Management and Trial Setting Conference
Date: August 11, 2023Affidavit of Mailing
Date: May 31, 2023Order
Date: May 23, 2023Affidavit of Mailing
Date: April 26, 2023Case Management Order
Date: April 26, 2023Order
Date: April 24, 2023Proof of Service - ELECTRONIC of
Date: April 14, 2023Order for Reassignment
Date: April 11, 2023Affidavit of Mailing
Date: April 11, 2023Proof of Service by MAIL of
Date: April 07, 2023Affidavit of Mailing
Date: March 20, 2023Case Management Order
Date: March 20, 2023Notice of Related Case
Date: March 16, 2023Notice
Date: March 16, 2023Notice
Date: March 16, 2023Notice of Assignment for All Purposes
Date: March 15, 2023Notice of Assignment for All Purposes
Date: March 10, 2023Proof of Service - ELECTRONIC of
Date: March 07, 2023Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: March 07, 2023Summons Issued / Filed
Date: March 07, 2023Petition for Writ of Mandate
Date: March 07, 2023Stip re Cont of Deadlines and Hearing on Writ
Date: March 22, 2024SOH - POS
Date: February 22, 2024SOH - Revised Stip
Date: February 22, 2024Case Managment
Date: January 04, 2024Petition for Writ of Mandate -Complaint
Date: March 08, 2023Summons
Date: March 08, 2023Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: March 08, 2023POS re Ltr of Intent to File CEQA Action
Date: March 08, 2023Petitioner Ntc of Election to Prepare Record
Date: March 16, 2023Petitioner_s Notice to Attorney General
Date: March 16, 2023Petitioner_s Notice of Related Case
Date: March 16, 2023SOH Def CSM 170.6 Motion
Date: April 05, 2023SOH Saenz Dec ISO Def CSM 170.6 Motion
Date: April 05, 2023SOH Def CSM Notice of Appearance
Date: April 05, 2023SOH POS
Date: April 07, 202374110Proof034a43
Date: April 14, 202374110Proof02a961
Date: April 14, 202374110Proof057dde
Date: April 14, 202374110Proof045faa
Date: April 14, 202374110Proof01d256
Date: April 14, 202374110Proof009f40
Date: April 14, 2023SOH Notice of ESC with POS
Date: April 28, 202375789Perem009322
Date: May 16, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 26, 2024 | Docket Event |
Petition for Writ of Mandate TO BE FILED Judge: Healy, Nicole S. |
|
June 12, 2024 | Docket Event |
Case Management and Trial Setting Conference
Judge: Healy, Nicole S. |
|
June 07, 2024 | Docket Event |
Case Management and Trial Setting Conference
Judge: Swope, V. Raymond |
|
March 26, 2024 | Docket Event | Stip re Cont | |
March 22, 2024 | Docket Event | Stip re Cont of Deadlines and Hearing on Writ | |
March 01, 2024 | Docket Event |
Order Deeming case Related 22CIV05125 Order Deeming case Related 22CIV05125 |
|
February 28, 2024 | Docket Event |
Affidavit of Mailing STIPULATION TO EXTEND SCHEDULE FOR RECORD PREPARATION, BRIEFING, AND HEARING; ORDER |
|
February 28, 2024 | Docket Event |
Stipulation & Order Type: STIPULATION TO EXTEND SCHEDULE FOR RECORD PREPARATION, BRIEFING, AND HEARI Stipulation & Order Type: STIPULATION TO EXTEND SCHEDULE FOR RECORD PREPARATION, BRIEFING, AND HEARING; ORDER Signed by: JUDGE NICOLE HEALY Date Signed: 2/28/2024 |
|
February 27, 2024 | Docket Event | Notice of Reassignment for All Purposes | |
February 22, 2024 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service - ELECTRONIC of STIPULATION TO EXTEND SCHEDULE FOR RECORD PREPARATION, BRIEFING, AN Proof of Service - ELECTRONIC of STIPULATION TO EXTEND SCHEDULE FOR RECORD PREPARATION, BRIEFING, AND HEARING; [PROPOSED] ORDER |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.