Case Last Refreshed: 2 weeks ago
Cagang, Ceferino, Cagang, Erlinda, filed a(n) General Property - Property case against Cagang, Christopher, Cagang, Herberth, Cagang, Joseph Jerome, Clear Reconveyance Corporation, Dizon, Sharon, (total of 10) See All represented by Knecht, Cathy A, in the jurisdiction of San Mateo County. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts Superior with Greenberg, Susan presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 21, 2023 |
Category(26) Unlimited Other Real Property |
Last RefreshedApril 13, 2024 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationSan Mateo County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
NOE of Order and Judgment
Date: April 11, 2024Proposed Judgment of Dismissal
Date: April 05, 2024Proposed Order on Demurrer to SAC
Date: April 04, 2024NOR on Demurrer to SAC
Date: April 04, 2024Notice of Assignment for All Purposes
Date: February 21, 2023Reply iso Demurrer to SAC
Date: March 27, 2024Notice of Hearing on Demurrer to SAC
Date: February 22, 2024RJN iso Demurrer to SAC
Date: February 20, 2024Demurrer to SAC
Date: February 20, 2024SDG Declaration re Meet and Confer
Date: February 20, 2024CMC
Date: January 09, 2024NOE of Order on Demurrer to FAC
Date: January 03, 2024Proposed Order on Demurrer to FAC
Date: December 29, 2023NOR on Demurrer to FAC
Date: December 29, 2023Reply iso Demurrer to FAC
Date: December 19, 2023Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: February 21, 2023Summons Issued / Filed
Date: February 21, 2023Demurrer to FAC
Date: November 01, 2023JD Declaration re Meet and Confer
Date: November 01, 2023RJN to Demurrer to FAC
Date: November 01, 2023Complaint
Date: February 21, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 13, 2060 | Docket Event | ||
April 11, 2024 | Docket Event | NOE of Order and Judgment | |
April 05, 2024 | Docket Event | Proposed Judgment of Dismissal | |
April 04, 2024 | Docket Event | Proposed Order on Demurrer to SAC | |
April 04, 2024 | Docket Event | NOR on Demurrer to SAC | |
March 27, 2024 | Docket Event | Reply iso Demurrer to SAC | |
February 22, 2024 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing on Demurrer to SAC | |
February 20, 2024 | Docket Event | RJN iso Demurrer to SAC | |
February 20, 2024 | Docket Event | Demurrer to SAC | |
February 20, 2024 | Docket Event | SDG Declaration re Meet and Confer |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.