Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Fratacci Caroline L, filed a(n) Harassment - Torts case against Ulacia Maria Stella, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Van Nuys East with Gary D. Roberts presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGary D. Roberts Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 18, 2022 |
CategoryCivil Harassment Prevention (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedAugust 03, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeHarassment |
Filing Court HouseVan Nuys East |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 21, 2022 | Hearing |
in Department Y, Roberts, Gary D, Presiding Restraining Order Hearing - Dismissed - TRO-Lack of Prosecution Judge: Roberts Gary D |
|
October 21, 2022 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
September 30, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116) Filed by Petitioner |
|
September 30, 2022 | Hearing |
in Department Y, Roberts, Gary D, Presiding Restraining Order Hearing - Not Held - Continued - Court's Own Motion Judge: Roberts Gary D |
|
September 30, 2022 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
September 09, 2022 | Hearing |
in Department Y, Roberts, Gary D, Presiding Restraining Order Hearing - Held - Continued Judge: Roberts Gary D |
|
September 09, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116) Filed by Petitioner |
|
September 09, 2022 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
September 08, 2022 | Docket Event |
Remote Appearance - Scheduled Filed by Petitioner |
|
August 23, 2022 | Docket Event | Temporary Restraining Order (Form 110) - Denied |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.